Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3402522

EP3402522 - BIOPHOTONIC COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF OTITIS EXTERNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bellini, Francesco
910 5th Avenue S.W.
Suite 2801
Calgary, Alberta T2P 0C3 / CA
For all designated states
Klox Technologies Limited
70 Sir John Rogerson's Quay
Dublin 2 / IE
For all designated states
Cerquetella, Matteo
School of Biosciences and Veterinary Medicine
Via Circonvallazione nn. 93/95
62024 Matelica / IT
For all designated states
Tambella, Adolfo Maria
School of Biosciences and Veterinary Medicine
Via Circonvallazione nn. 93/95
62024 Matelica / IT
For all designated states
Spaterna, Andrea
School of Biosciences and Veterinary Medicine
Via Circonvallazione, 93/95
62024 Matelica / IT
For all designated states
Loupis, Nikolaos
Kifissias 228 Avenue
Kifissia
14562 Athens / GR
For all designated states
Ohayon, David
40 Pierre Trudeau
Dollard-des-Ormeaux
Québec H9A 3J8 / CA
For all designated states
Piergallini, Remigio
Piazza Nardone, 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
[2018/47]
Inventor(s)01 / BELLINI, Francesco
910-5th Avenue S.W.
Suite 2801
Calgary, Alberta T2P 0C3 / CA
02 / CERQUETELLA, Matteo
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
03 / TAMBELLA, Adolfo Maria
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
04 / SPATERNA, Andrea
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
05 / LOUPIS, Nikolaos
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / GR
06 / OHAYON, David
40 Pierre Trudeau
Dollard-des-Ormeaux, Québec H9A 3J8 / CA
07 / PIERGALLINI, Remigio
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
 [2019/03]
Former [2018/47]01 / BELLINI, Francesco
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / CA
02 / CERQUETELLA, Matteo
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
03 / TAMBELLA, Adolfo Maria
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
04 / SPATERNA, Andrea
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
05 / LOUPIS, Nikolaos
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / GR
06 / OHAYON, David
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / CA
07 / PIERGALLINI, Remigio
Piazza Nardone 19
63036 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT
Representative(s)Be IP
Cabinet LTL SAS
Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation
56, Bd Niels Bohr
CS 52132
69603 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR
[2018/47]
Application number, filing date17738059.911.01.2017
[2018/47]
WO2017CA50032
Priority number, dateUS201662277263P11.01.2016         Original published format: US 201662277263 P
[2018/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017120671
Date:20.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3402522
Date:21.11.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017
[2018/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA20.07.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K33/40, A61K31/17, A61K31/352, A61K31/4166, A61K31/7008, A61K31/715, A61P31/02, A61P27/16, A61K45/06, A61K41/00, A61K47/32, A61K47/38, A61K9/00, A61K9/06
[2019/30]
Former International [2018/47]A61K41/00, A61P27/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/47]
TitleGerman:BIOPHOTONISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OTITIS EXTERNA[2018/47]
English:BIOPHOTONIC COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF OTITIS EXTERNA[2018/47]
French:COMPOSITIONS BIOPHOTONIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'OTITE EXTERNE[2018/47]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2018National basic fee paid 
03.08.2018Search fee paid 
03.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]CA2806094  (ADVANCED PHOTODYNAMIC TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-68 * (see entire document) *;
 [Y]US2008119914  (ROSE ANDREAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-68 * (see entire document) *;
 [Y]WO2007025244  (HOULE PHILIP R [US]) [Y] 1-68 * (see entire document) *;
 [Y]WO2010051636  (KLOX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-68 * (see entire document) *;
 [Y]WO2010051641  (KLOX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-68 * (see entire document) *
 [Y]  - Sug man Lee, "Photodynamic Therapy Using a 632 nm Diode Laser on Otitis Externa of the Dog", Journal of Veterinary Clinic, (20140000), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.17555/ksvc.2014.02.31.1.66 , ISSN 1598-298X, pages 66 - 69, XP009512097 [Y] 1-68 * . (see entire document) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.17555/ksvc.2014.02.31.1.66
 [Y]  - STREET et al., "In Vitro Photodynamic Eradication of Pseudomonas aeruginosa in Planktonic and Biofilm Culture", Photochemistry and Photobiology, (20090000), vol. 85, pages 137 - 143, XP055399257 [Y] 1-68 * . (see abstract) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-1097.2008.00407.x
 [Y]  - LINS et al., "Enhancement of Antimicrobial Action of Photodynamic Therapy in the Presence of Hydrogen Peroxide", Microbial Pathogens and Strategies for Combating Them: Science , Technology and Education, (20130000), pages 367 - 371, URL: httus://www.researchgate.net/publication/283644315, XP055399260 [Y] 1-68 * (see entire document) *
 [Y]  - CACCIANIGA et al., "Photodynamic therapy (Association diode laser /hydrogen peroxide): Evaluation of bacterial effects on periodontopathic bacteria: An In Vitro study", European Journal of Inflammation, (20120101), vol. 10, no. S2, doi:10.1177/1721727X120100S220, pages 101 - 106, XP008175686 [Y] 1-68 * . (see entire document) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1721727X120100S220
 [Y]  - AWAD et al., "In vitro Photodynamic Antimicrobial Activity of Protoporphyrin IX in the Presence of Hydrogen Peroxide against Staphylococcus aureus and Pseudomonas aeruginosa", British Microbiology Research Journal, (20140000), vol. 4, no. 11, pages 1219 - 1234, XP055399268 [Y] 1-68 * . (see entire document) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.9734/BMRJ/2014/10482