EP3388932 - FLEXIBLE DISPLAY OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEO, Junghee c/o 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Hayoul c/o 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 17738645.5 | 12.01.2017 | [2018/42] | WO2017KR00400 | Priority number, date | KR20160003804 | 12.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160003804 | [2018/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017123016 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388932 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3388932 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484, G06F1/16, G06F3/0486 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F1/1626 (US);
G06F1/1652 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
H04M1/0268 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE ANZEIGE EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2018/42] | English: | FLEXIBLE DISPLAY OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2018/42] | French: | ÉCRAN FLEXIBLE D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2018 | Translation filed | 12.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 12.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2020 | 15.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22159623.2 / EP4030272 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.03.2022 | AT | 23.03.2022 | CZ | 23.03.2022 | DK | 23.03.2022 | EE | 23.03.2022 | ES | 23.03.2022 | FI | 23.03.2022 | HR | 23.03.2022 | IT | 23.03.2022 | LT | 23.03.2022 | LV | 23.03.2022 | MC | 23.03.2022 | NL | 23.03.2022 | PL | 23.03.2022 | RO | 23.03.2022 | RS | 23.03.2022 | SE | 23.03.2022 | SI | 23.03.2022 | SK | 23.03.2022 | SM | 23.03.2022 | BG | 23.06.2022 | NO | 23.06.2022 | GR | 24.06.2022 | IS | 23.07.2022 | PT | 25.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.03.2022 | |
NO | 23.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2010117975 (CHO YOUNG MIN [KR]) [Y] 1-32 * See paragraphs [0003], [0080]-[0081], [0089], [0106], [0136]; claim 1; and figures 5, 14. *; | [Y]KR20150016402 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [Y] 15, 27 * See paragraphs [0298]-[0299] and figure 59. *; | [Y]KR20150112239 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-32 * See paragraphs [0064], [0066], [0073], [0075], [0103], [0108]; claim 8; and figures 2, 4a-6. *; | [Y]KR20160000110 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 8-11, 13-19, 23-31 * See paragraphs [0027], [0032], [0174], [0189], [0224], [0227]-[0230], [0299]-[0300], [03 15]; and figures 5-6b, 12-13, 23, 27. *; | [A] - RUBENSON Troy, "IPHONE 6 RELEASE DATE, CONCEPT BORROWS SAMSUNG IDEA OF EDGE-TO-EDGE DISPLAY", stateschronicle.com, (20130821), URL: http://stateschronicle.com/tag/]iphone-6-concept, XP055510746 [A] 1-32 * See page 4. * | Examination | US2016004376 |