Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463116

EP3463116 - MODULAR BODY CAVITY ACCESS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3NT Medical Ltd.
22 Hamelacha Street Building 3 Entrance B
POB 11384
4809169 Rosh Ha'azin / IL
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BENDORY, Ehud
8 Hanadiv Street
4648512 Herzliya / IL
02 / BENDORY, Eran
19 Rotem Street
7179902 Maccabim Reut / IL
03 / HEFER, Gil
59 Yuvalim Street
1790600 Shimshit / IL
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Zanettin, Gianluigi
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza Mario Saggin, 2
35131 Padova / IT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17739305.506.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IB00756
Priority number, dateUS201662345891P06.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345891 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212332
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463116
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/24, A61B17/34, A61M25/01, A61B17/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MODULARES KÖRPERHÖHLENZUGANGSSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:MODULAR BODY CAVITY ACCESS SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS MODULAIRE À UNE CAVITÉ CORPORELLE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
06.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2012071857  (GOLDFARB ERIC A [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,10,12-17,20-23,33,36,37,39-44,47-49 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] - [0064] - [0068] , [0073] , [0076] - [0078] - [0080] , [0105] , [0110] * [A] 8,18,19,38,45,46 [I] 2,3,7,11,34,35;
 [A]US2015289754  (BENDORY EHUD [IL], et al) [A] 1-23,33-49 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014358177  (SCHRECK THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1,33 * abstract *;
 [A]US2015141819  (LINDEN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1,9-12,33,39-41 * abstract *
by applicantUS6251115
 US5788713
 US7625356