Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465889

EP3465889 - ELECTRIC MOTOR ROTOR DISCHARGE PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tesla, Inc.
3500 Deer Creek Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAVES, Scott Michael
11100 Sequoia Avenue
Felton, CA 95018 / US
02 / SILVA RODRIGUEZ, Diego Alberto
19500 Pruneridge Avenue 7108
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
03 / HAIN, Alexander
Gebeschusstraße 3
65929 Frankfurt Höchst / DE
04 / GRENDAHL, Tyler Nils
PO Box 540255
Waltham, MA 02454 / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Eva
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17739366.707.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US36300
Priority number, dateUS201662346741P07.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662346741 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214239
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465889
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02K11/40, H02K7/08, H02K5/173
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ENTLADUNGSSCHUTZ FÜR ROTOR EINES ELEKTROMOTORS[2019/15]
English:ELECTRIC MOTOR ROTOR DISCHARGE PROTECTION[2019/15]
French:PROTECTION CONTRE LES DÉCHARGES DE ROTOR D'UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2000316251  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,4-13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009]; figures 9,10 * * paragraph [0005] * [Y] 1,9;
 [X]EP2549626  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12,13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0025]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029]; figures 4-9 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figure 12 *;
 [X]US2003057783  (MELFI MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032]; figure 3 *;
 [X]US2010001602  (BOSSALLER TERRY L [US], et al) [X] 14-20 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017]; figure 2 *;
 [X]US2010127585  (FEE DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 14-20 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE102013219186  (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,9 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US2013071057  (FISCHER RAPHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1,9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP1114939  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 14-20 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072]; figure 6 *