Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469099

EP3469099 - DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS FOR CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YAUCH, Robert, L.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US
02 / YE, Xiaofen
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US
03 / JANUARIO, Thomas, E.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Brodbeck, Michel
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Patent Department
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17739384.008.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36515
Priority number, dateUS201662347436P08.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347436 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214373
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469099
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSE- UND THERAPIEVERFAHREN FÜR KREBS[2019/16]
English:DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS FOR CANCER[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS DIAGNOSTIQUES ET THÉRAPEUTIQUES RELATIFS AU CANCER[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IP]WO2017053930  (EPIZYME INC [US]) [IP] 1-93 * claims 1-3 * * example 4 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] - [0053] , [0072] *;
 [XAI]WO2014062720  (EPIZYME INC [US]) [X] 1-9,12,15-17,19-25,47-59,62,65-67,69-71,87,88,90 * claims 1-33 * * examples 1-2 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0055] - [0059] - [0060] - [0063] - [0065] - [0069] - [0077] - [0084] , [0140] , [ 330] - [0342] - [0371] - [0372] * [A] 26-46,89 [I] 10,11,13,14,18,60,61,63,64,68,72-86;
 [X]WO2012138783  (NETHERLANDS CANCER INST [NL]; BERNARDS RENE [NL]; HUANG SIDONG [NL]; H) [X] 91-93 * claims 47-56 * * page 68 *;
 [A]WO2014176047  (NOVARTIS AG [CH]; BROAD INST INC [US]; CHAN HO MAN [US]; GIBAJA VERONI) [A] 1-93 * claims 1-13 * * example 2 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0039] *;
 [IP]  - ELAYNE CHAN-PENEBRE ET AL, "Selective Killing of SMARCA2- and SMARCA4-deficient Small Cell Carcinoma of the Ovary, Hypercalcemic Type Cells by Inhibition of EZH2: In Vitro and In Vivo Preclinical Models", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, US, (20170314), vol. 16, no. 5, doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-16-0678, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 850 - 860, XP055410385 [IP] 1-25,47-93 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 852, column 2, paragraph last - page 854, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-16-0678
 [A]  - M. Y. TOLSTORUKOV ET AL, "Swi/Snf chromatin remodeling/tumor suppressor complex establishes nucleosome occupancy at target promoters", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20130530), vol. 110, no. 25, doi:10.1073/pnas.1302209110, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10165 - 10170, XP055410827 [A] 26-46,89 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1302209110
 [A]  - KIMBERLY H KIM ET AL, "SWI/SNF-mutant cancers depend on catalytic and non-catalytic activity of EZH2", NATURE MEDICINE, (20151109), vol. 21, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nm.3968, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1491 - 1496, XP055410199 [A] 1-93 * the whole document * * figure 2 * * page 1495, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.3968
by applicantUS4683195
 US4943533
 WO9640210
 US5212290
 US5891996
 WO9850433
 US6235883
 EP0659439
 US5616582
 US5457105
 US5475001
 US5654307
 US5679683
 US6084095
 US6265410
 US6455534
 US6521620
 US6596726
 US6713484
 US5770599
 US6140332
 US5866572
 US6399602
 US6344459
 US6602863
 US6391874
 US6344455
 US5760041
 US6002008
 US5747498
 WO9814451
 WO9850038
 WO9909016
 WO9924037
 US5804396
 WO9843960
 WO9738983
 WO9906378
 WO9906396
 WO9630347
 WO9633978
 WO9603397
 WO9633980
    - MULLIS, Cold Spring Harbor Symp. Quant. BioI., (19870000), vol. 51, page 263
    - CRONIN, Am. J. Pathol., (20040000), vol. 164, no. 1, pages 35 - 42
    - MA et al., Cancer Ceil, (20040000), vol. 5, pages 607 - 616
    - NICOLAOU et al., Angew. Chem IntI. Ed. Engl., (19940000), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186
    - STRAGLIOTTO et al., Eur. J. Cancer, (19960000), vol. 32A, pages 636 - 640
    - JOHNS, J. Biol. Chern., (20040000), vol. 279, no. 29, pages 30375 - 30384
    - WILMAN, "Biochemical Society Transactions", Prodrugs in Cancer Chemotherapy, (19860000), vol. 14, pages 375 - 382
    - STELLA, "Prodrugs: A Chemical Approach to Targeted Drug Delivery", STELLA, Borchardt et a!.,, Directed Drug Delivery, Humana Press, (19850000), pages 247 - 267
    - YAMADA, Cancer Sci., (20130000), vol. 104, pages 14 - 21
    - WATANABE, RNA Biol., (20160000), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 25 - 33
    - WU; NACU, Bioinformatics., (20100000), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 873 - 881
    - LAW et al., Genome Biol., (20140000), vol. 15, no. 2, page R29
    - HOCHBERG, Genome Biol., (20140000), vol. 15, no. 2, page R29