Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468647

EP3468647 - SPACER ASSEMBLY FOR DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
1 Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / QUINN, Michael, Vincent
42 Tiffany Drive
East Hanover, New Jersey 07936 / US
02 / PALA, Trivikrama, Bhanoji
1391 D Valley Road
Wayne, New Jersey 07470 / US
03 / SONG, Philip
14 W. 7th St.
Clifton, New Jersey 07011 / US
04 / PLUMPTRE, David, Aubrey
36 Shire Way
Droitwich, Worcestershire WR9 7RQ / GB
05 / BOYD, Malcolm, Stanley
28 Whitehead Drive
Wellesbourne, Warwickshire CV35 9PW / GB
06 / QUINN, Peter
66 Pomander Walk
Ridgewood, New Jersey 07450 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17739390.708.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36591
Priority number, dateUS201662347911P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347911 P
US20171561618307.06.2017         Original published format: US201715616183
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017214424
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3468647
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/315, A61M5/142, A61M5/20, A61M5/32
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:DISTANZSTÜCKANORDNUNG FÜR EIN WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM[2019/16]
English:SPACER ASSEMBLY FOR DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:ENSEMBLE D'ÉCARTEMENT POUR SYSTÈME ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2016075254  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-17 * page 2, lines 14-20 * * figure 10 *;
 [A]US5062830  (DUNLAP KENNETH W [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 6, lines 37-46 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]EP1944048  (ANIMAS CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * figures 6,7,8,10 *;
 [A]US2010280461  (FORSTREUTER AXEL [DE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0056] * * figures 1-3 *
by applicantWO2013155153
 WO2014179774
 WO2015081337