Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469008

EP3469008 - BIOCOMPATIBLE ZWITTERIONIC POLYMER COATINGS AND HYDROGELS FOR REDUCING FOREIGN BODY RESPONSE AND FIBROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute Of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
The Children's Medical Center Corporation
55 Shattuck Street
Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / VEISEH, Omid
4903 Palmetto St
Bellaire, TX 77401-3415 / US
02 / YESILYURT, Volkan
202 Sycamore Street
Watertown MA 02472 / US
03 / VEGAS, Arturo
1041 Concord Avenue
Belmont MA 02478 / US
04 / DOLOFF, Joshua
2 Hancock Street Apt. 208
Quincy MA 02171 / US
05 / ANDERSON, Daniel, G.
78 Carter Drive
Framingham MA 01701 / US
06 / LANGER, Robert, S.
98 Montvale Road
Newton MA 02459 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]01 / VEISEH, Omid
1105 Massachusetts Ave. Apt. 10E
Cambridge MA 02138 / US
02 / YESILYURT, Volkan
202 Sycamore Street
Watertown MA 02472 / US
03 / VEGAS, Arturo
1041 Concord Avenue
Belmont MA 02478 / US
04 / DOLOFF, Joshua
2 Hancock Street Apt. 208
Quincy MA 02171 / US
05 / ANDERSON, Daniel, G.
78 Carter Drive
Framingham MA 01701 / US
06 / LANGER, Robert, S.
98 Montvale Road
Newton MA 02459 / US
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17739397.213.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37214
Priority number, dateUS201662349408P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349408 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218507
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469008
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08F20/38, C08F30/02, A61L27/52, A61L31/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BIOKOMPATIBLE ZWITTERIONISCHE POLYMERBESCHICHTUNGEN UND HYDROGELE ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON FREMDKÖRPERREAKTION UND FIBROSE[2019/16]
English:BIOCOMPATIBLE ZWITTERIONIC POLYMER COATINGS AND HYDROGELS FOR REDUCING FOREIGN BODY RESPONSE AND FIBROSIS[2019/16]
French:REVÊTEMENTS POLYMÈRES ZWITTERIONIQUES BIOCOMPATIBLES ET HYDROGELS DESTINÉS À RÉDUIRE LA RÉPONSE AUX CORPS ÉTRANGERS ET LA FIBROSE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2018National basic fee paid 
28.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
28.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO03085372  (THERASENSE INC [US]) [X] 1-4,11,12,15-19 * page 10 - page 18; figure -; claim -; compounds 1-6 * [I] 5-10,13,14,20-41;
 [XI]  - MINGHAO SUN ET AL, "Functionalization of quantum dots with multidentate zwitterionic ligands: impact on cellular interactions and cytotoxicity", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY B, GB, (20130101), vol. 1, no. 44, doi:10.1039/c3tb20894j, ISSN 2050-750X, page 6137, XP055405136 [X] 1,2,11-14,17-19,21 * abstract * [I] 3-10,15,16,20-41

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3tb20894j
 [XI]  - WEST S L ET AL, "The biocompatibility of crosslinkable copolymer coatings containing sulfobetaines and phosphobetaines", BIOMATERI, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20040301), vol. 25, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2003.08.010, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 1195 - 1204, XP004475063 [X] 1,2,11-13,15-19,21-41 * abstract * [I] 3-10,14,20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2003.08.010
 [XI]  - CHIEN-YUAN CHEN ET AL, "Multifunctional Biocompatible Membrane and Its Application to Fabricate A Miniaturized Glucose Sensor with Potential for Use In Vivo", BIOMEDICAL MICRODEVICES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (19981201), vol. 1, no. 2, doi:10.1023/A:1009952625595, ISSN 1572-8781, pages 155 - 166, XP019205049 [X] 1,2,11,12,17-19 * figures 2, 4-8; compound MB * [I] 3-10,13-16,20-41

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1009952625595
 [XI]  - WANG YAN-BING ET AL, "Significantly reduced adsorption and activation of blood components in a membrane oxygenator system coated with crosslinkable zwitterionic copolymer", ACTA BIOMATERIALIA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160308), vol. 40, doi:10.1016/J.ACTBIO.2016.02.036, ISSN 1742-7061, pages 153 - 161, XP029652900 [X] 1,2,11-13,17-19,21 * abstract * [I] 3-10,14-16,20,21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actbio.2016.02.036
by applicantUS2015037598
 US5447863
 US5322790
 US5273904
 US4868121
 US5821121
    - ANDERSON et al., Semin. Immunol., (20080000), vol. 20, pages 86 - 100
    - LANGER, Adv. Mater., (20090000), vol. 21, pages 3235 - 3236
    - WARD, J. Diabetes Sci. Technol., (20080000), vol. 2, pages 768 - 777
    - HARDING; REYNOLDS, Trends Biotechnol., (20140000), vol. 32, pages 140 - 146
    - GRAINGER, Nat. Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 31, pages 507 - 509
    - WILLIAMS, Biomaterials, (20080000), vol. 29, pages 2941 - 2953
    - WICK et al., Annu. Rev. Immunol., (20130000), vol. 31, pages 107 - 135
    - WYNN; RAMALINGAM, Nat. Med., (20120000), vol. 18, pages 1028 - 1040
    - ZHANG et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 31, pages 553 - 556
    - SUSSMAN et al., Ann. Biomed. Eng., (20130000), vol. 1-9
    - RODRIGUEZ et al., J. Biomed. Mater. Res. A, (20090000), vol. 89, pages 152 - 159
    - HETRICK et al., Biomaterials, (20070000), vol. 28, pages 4571 - 4580
    - RATNER, J. Controlled Release, (20020000), vol. 78, pages 211 - 218
    - WANG et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 602 - 606
    - FIELD et al., Transplantation, (19960000), vol. 61, page 1554
    - LINETSKY et al., Diabetes, (19970000), vol. 46, page 1120
    - VEGAS et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20160000), vol. 34, page 345
    - LEE et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 318, page 426
    - LEE et al., Adv. Mater., (20090000), vol. 21, page 431
    - HAM et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20110000), vol. 50, page 732
    - VEISEH et al., Nat. Mater., (20150000), vol. 14, page 643
    - LEE; MOONEY, Prog. Poly. Sci., (20120000), vol. 37, page 106
    - KING et al., J. Biomed. Mater. Res., (20010000), vol. 57, page 374
    - SCHARP; MARCHETTI, P. Adv. Drug. Deliv. Rev., (20140000), vol. 67-68, page 35
    - MA et al., Adv. Mater., (20110000), vol. 23, page H189
    - SPASOJEVIC et al., PLoS One, (20140000), vol. 9, page e109837
    - LIM; SUN, Science, (19800000), vol. 210, page 908
    - SEETHO et al., ACS Macro Lett., (20150000), vol. 4, page 505
    - CHEN et al., Macromolecules, (20130000), vol. 46, page 119
    - KIM et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20140000), vol. 53, page 14443
    - BRATLIE, K. et al., Plos One, (20100000), vol. 5, no. 4, page el0032