Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472188

EP3472188 - NEMATODE RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Keygene N.V.
P.O. Box 216
6700 AE Wageningen / NL
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DILEO, Matthew Vitabile
701
Dryden St
SILVER SPRING Maryland 20901 / US
02 / MUNKVOLD, Jesse David
621 Ivy League Lane
Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US
03 / DE VOS, Martin
c/o P.O. Box 216
6700 AE Wageningen / NL
04 / TOMCZAK, Anna Maria
c/o P.O. Box 216
6700 AE Wageningen / NL
05 / GORITSCHNIG, Sandra
c/o P.O. Box 216
6700 AE Wageningen / NL
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17739712.216.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017NL50400
Priority number, dateNL2016201698016.06.2016         Original published format: NL 2016980
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217852
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472188
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/415, C12N15/82
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:NEMATODENRESISTENZ[2019/17]
English:NEMATODE RESISTANCE[2019/17]
French:RÉSISTANCE AUX NÉMATODES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2008095972  (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-43;
 [A]WO2008139334  (GENOPLANTE VALOR [FR], et al) [A] 1-43;
 [A]WO2011104153  (BASF PLANT SCIENCE CO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-43;
 [A]  - W. GRUNEWALD ET AL, "A Role for AtWRKY23 in Feeding Site Establishment of Plant-Parasitic Nematodes", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, Rockville, Md, USA, (20080718), vol. 148, no. 1, doi:10.1104/pp.108.119131, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 358 - 368, XP055345302 [A] 1-43

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.108.119131
 [A]  - MUHAMMAD AMJAD ALI ET AL, "The Beet Cyst Nematode Heterodera schachtii Modulates the Expression of WRKY Transcription Factors in Syncytia to Favour Its Development in Arabidopsis Roots", PLOS ONE, (20140717), vol. 9, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0102360, page e102360, XP055345299 [A] 1-43 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0102360
 [A]  - SHREE P PANDEY AND IMRE E SOMSSICH, "The Role of WRKY Transcription Factors in Plant Immunity", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, USA, vol. 150, no. 4, doi:10.1104/PP.109.138990, ISSN 0032-0889, (20090801), pages 1648 - 1655, (20090501), XP002669842 [A] 1-43

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/PP.109.138990
 [A]  - GRZECHOWIAK MARTA, "The role of WRKY transcription factors in plants", BIOTECHNOLOGIA (POZNAN), (2014), vol. 95, no. 3, ISSN 0860-7796, pages 215 - 233, XP002767298 [A] 1-43
 [A]  - HAGOP S ATAMIAN ET AL, "is required for--mediated resistance to aphids and nematodes in tomato", PLANTA ; AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20110907), vol. 235, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S00425-011-1509-6, ISSN 1432-2048, pages 299 - 309, XP035008066 [A] 1-43

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00425-011-1509-6
 [A]  - ADNAN YOUNIS ET AL, "RNA Interference (RNAi) Induced Gene Silencing: A Promising Approach of Hi-Tech Plant Breeding", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, Australia, (20140101), vol. 10, no. 10, doi:10.7150/ijbs.10452, ISSN 1449-2288, pages 1150 - 1158, XP055273136 [A] 1-43

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/ijbs.10452
by applicant   - BAUM et al., Genetic Engineering, (20070000), vol. 28, page 17
    - JONES et al., Molecular Plant Pathology, (20130000), vol. 14, no. 9, page 946
    - RAHMAN et al., Journal of Environmental Science and Health, (20130000), vol. 48, page 16
    - HEWEZI; BAUM, MPMI, (20130000), vol. 26, no. 1, page 9
    - GRUNDER; HOFMANN, Genomics and Molecular Genetics of Plant-Nematode Interactions, (20110000), page 423
    - HAYDOCK et al., Plant Nematology, (20130000), page 459
    - DAVIES; ELLING, Nematology, (20150000), vol. 17, page 249
    - KYNDT et al., New Phytologist, (20120000), vol. 196, page 887
    - JONES; GOTO, Genomics and Molecular Genetics of Plant-Nematode Interactions, (20110000), page 83
    - BELLAFIORE; BIGGS, Current Opinion in Plant Biology, (20100000), vol. 13, page 442
    - GHEYSEN; MITCHUM, Current Opinion in Plant Biology, (20110000), vol. 14, pages 415 - 421
    - Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press
    - EULGEM et al., Trends in Plant Science, (20000000), vol. 5, pages 199 - 206
    - RUSHTON et al., Trends in Plant Science, (20100000), vol. 15, pages 247 - 258
    - CARILLO, H.; LIPTON, D., SIAM J. Applied Math, (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073
    - CARILLO, H.; LIPTON, D.; SIAM J., Applied Math, (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073
    - DEVEREUX, J. et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, no. 1, page 387
    - ATSCHUL, S. F. et al., J. Molec. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, page 403
    - MCCALLUM et al., Nat Biotech, (20000000), vol. 18, page 455
    - MCCALLUM et al., Plant Physiol., (20000000), vol. 123, pages 439 - 442