Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469718

EP3469718 - REMOTE DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM EMPLOYING REFERENCE SIGNALS IN ITS WIRELESS BACKHAUL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Intellectual Property I, L.P.
675 West Peachtree Street
Suite 4000
Atlanta, GA 30308 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BARZEGAR, Farhad
14 Farrington Lane
Branchburg, New Jersey 08876 / US
02 / HENRY, Paul Shala
7 Crow Field Lane
Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US
03 / BLANDINO, George
36 Bradley Lane
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
04 / GERSZBERG, Irwin
12 Dickinson Road
Kendall Park, New Jersey 08824 / US
05 / BARNICKEL, Donald J.
3 Wells Road
Flemington, New Jersey 30308 / US
06 / WILLIS III, Thomas M.
10 Beverly Court
Tinton Falls, New Jersey 07724 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Asquith, Julian Peter
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17739734.607.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36266
Priority number, dateUS20161517919310.06.2016         Original published format: US201615179193
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214222
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469718
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/40, H04B7/155, H04W88/08, H01P3/10, H04B1/04, H04B3/52, H04B3/54
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERTEILTES FERNANTENNENSYSTEM MIT ANWENDUNG VON REFERENZSIGNALEN IN SEINEM DRAHTLOSEN BACKHAUL[2019/16]
English:REMOTE DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM EMPLOYING REFERENCE SIGNALS IN ITS WIRELESS BACKHAUL[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME D'ANTENNES RÉPARTIES À DISTANCE UTILISANT DES SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE DANS SA LIAISON TERRESTRE SANS FIL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2014355525  (BARZEGAR FARHAD [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0016] - [0026] - [0039] - [0041]; figures 1,6 *;
 [Y]US2016142196  (SABAN OFER [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0041] , [0057] - [0065]; figures 9,10 *;
 [A]US2015188584  (LAURENT-MICHEL STEPHANE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0012] - [0039]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2010284446  (MU FENGHAO [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0046] - [0054] - [0161]; figure 1 *