Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469598

EP3469598 - VACUUM BREAKER VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ge-Hitachi Nuclear Energy Americas LLC
3901 Castle Hayne Road
Wilmington, NC 28401 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ANTHONY, Gary, M.
3901 Castle Hayne Road
Wilmington NC 28401 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Wilhelmstraße 7
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Williams, Andrew Richard
GE International Inc.
GPO-Europe The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date17739756.909.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36906
Priority number, dateUS20161517788609.06.2016         Original published format: US201615177886
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214600
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469598
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G21C9/004, G21C13/02, F16K17/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VAKUUMSCHALTVENTILANORDNUNG[2019/16]
English:VACUUM BREAKER VALVE ASSEMBLY[2019/16]
French:ENSEMBLE DE CLAPET CASSE-VIDE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5898748  (THOMPSON JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13,15-19 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 56; figure 1 * [Y] 8,14;
 [XY]WO2016085573  (BWXT MPOWER INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10,14-18 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 26]; figures 2, 3 * [Y] 8,14;
 [Y]US2013056667  (SHU JIANCHAO [US]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0004]; figure 1 *