Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473020

EP3473020 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZING THE LOW-FREQUENCY SOUND RENDITION OF AN AUDIO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arkamys
31 rue Pouchet
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / POSTEL, François
140 Rue de Belleville
75020 PARIS / FR
02 / VIDAL, Jacquemin
49 Rue Gallieni
91310 Leuville-sur-orge / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Ipside
7-9 Allées Haussmann
33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17740054.619.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017FR51599
Priority number, dateFR2016005569820.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655698
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220906
Date:28.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473020
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04R3/04, H03G5/00, H03G9/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER NIEDERFREQUENTEN KLANGWIEDERGABE EINES AUDIOSIGNALS[2019/17]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZING THE LOW-FREQUENCY SOUND RENDITION OF AN AUDIO SIGNAL[2019/17]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR L'OPTIMISATION DU RENDU SONORE DE BASSES FREQUENCES D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2916457  (SENNHEISER COMM AS [DK]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0012] , [0065] *;
 [X]EP0820212  (BERNAFON AG [CH]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 4, lines 27-44; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2012308036  (CHRISTOPH MARKUS [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0014] *
by applicantWO2013068359