Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468401 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468401



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 141
03.02.2020 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.01.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.12.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.12.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
03.12.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
03.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.10.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.10.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.10.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.10.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
21.10.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 14
23.09.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
24.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
21.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.11.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 6
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 15
11.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
11.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
11.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3