Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3468401


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.12.2019 (Expected) grant published on  22.01.2020  [2020/04]
07.12.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.12.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.12.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.10.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
24.07.2019 Amendment by applicant
02.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
18.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
24.12.2018 Change - representative
24.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
27.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication