Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3468401
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3468401Global Dossier 22.01.2020B1
EP3468401 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
ITUA20164212 08.06.2016
WO2017IB53358 07.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017212417Global Dossier 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
ITUA20164212 08.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITUA20164212 08.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
ITUA20164212 08.06.2016