Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468401

EP3468401 - ARTICLE OF CLOTHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.12.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siggi Group S.p.A.
Via Vicenza 23
36030 San Vito di Leguzzano (VI) / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MARTA, Silvia
c/o Siggi Group S.p.A.
Via Vicenza 23
36030 San Vito di Leguzzano (VI) / IT
02 / MARTA, Federica
c/o Siggi Group S.p.A.
Via Vicenza 23
36030 San Vito di Leguzzano (VI) / IT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Fisauli, Beatrice A. M.
Con Lor S.p.A
Via Bronzino, 8
20133 Milano / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17740094.207.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB53358
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0421208.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164212
[2019/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212417
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468401
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3468401
Date:22.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A41D13/01, A41D3/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEKLEIDUNGSARTIKEL[2019/16]
English:ARTICLE OF CLOTHING[2019/16]
French:ARTICLE D'HABILLEMENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
21.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2019Fee for grant paid
03.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2008178363  (BLAUER STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2164541  (BACON ALBERT EDWARD, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN105212349  (JIANGSU YUNFU FASHION CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR1427871  (M A C ETS) [A] 1 * figures 1,3,6 *;
 [A]JP2003221712  (SHIGA PREF GOV) [A] 1 * figures 1,8 *