Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471795

EP3471795 - DEVICE FOR THE INJECTION OF FLUIDS WITH INTERNAL MIXING RIBS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIDAM S.r.l.
Via Statale Sud, 169
Frazione San Giacomo Roncole
41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / AZZOLINI, Graziano
Via Sant'Anna 3/R
41032 Cavezzo (MO) / IT
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Brunacci, Marco
BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l.
Via Scaglia Est, 19-31
41126 Modena / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17740106.420.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IB53660
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0457721.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164577
[2019/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221148
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471795
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/00, A61M5/31, A61M5/315
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR INJEKTION VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT INTERNEN MISCHRIPPEN[2019/17]
English:DEVICE FOR THE INJECTION OF FLUIDS WITH INTERNAL MIXING RIBS[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE FLUIDES AVEC NERVURES INTERNES DE MÉLANGE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2003199815  (TROMBLEY FREDERICK W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7-11 * paragraphs [0056] - [0059]; figures 1A-1B, 3-8 * [I] 6;
 [X]WO02089960  (PRISMEDICAL CORP [US]; TAYLOR MICHAEL [US]; FITZGERALD CAROLYN [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, lines 5-18; figure - *;
 [A]WO9927981  (BRACCO RESEARCH SA [CH]) [A] 1-11 * pages 4-9; figures 1,4 *