Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471953

EP3471953 - A BOX TEMPLATE PRODUCTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Packsize LLC
3760 West Smart Pack Way
Salt Lake City, UT 84104 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PETTERSSON, Niklas
Ragnaröksgatan 9
723 55 Västerås / SE
02 / BLOMBERG, Johan
Ingvarsgatan 51
753 34 Uppsala / SE
03 / BERTOLINI, Graziano
c/o Packsize Technologies AB
Gesällgatan 2
745039 Enköping / SE
04 / THUNELL, Björn
c/o Packsize Technologies AB
Gesällgatan 2
745 39 Enköping / SE
05 / OSTERHOUT, Ryan
2800 West 3825 South
West Haven UT 84401 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17740149.408.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US36603
Priority number, dateUS201662351127P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351127 P
US201662425457P22.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662425457 P
SE2016005168219.12.2016         Original published format: SE 1651682
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218296
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471953
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B31B50/10, B31B50/02, B65H16/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHACHTELZUSCHNITTS[2019/17]
English:A BOX TEMPLATE PRODUCTION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MODÈLE DE BOÎTE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2018National basic fee paid 
23.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
23.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010091043  (PACKSIZE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2013106180  (PACKSIZE LLC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0027]; figure 3 *;
 [A]JPS5557984  (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19541061  (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [A] 1,8,13 * abstract *