Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3481926

EP3481926 - LUBRICATING MEMBER FOR RAZOR CARTRIDGES COMPRISING METATHESIZED UNSATURATED POLYOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2019/20]
Inventor(s)01 / ZANNONI, Luke Andrew
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
02 / SCHUBERT, Beth Ann
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
03 / PANANDIKER, Rajan Keshav
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
04 / KEMPER, Joseph Jay
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
05 / STRIFE, Robert John
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
06 / MOTLAGH, Safa
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
07 / SCHEIBEL, Jeffrey John
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
08 / STEPHENS, Alison Fiona
c/o Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd
Whitehall Lane
Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
09 / SAWIN, Philip Andrew
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
 [2019/20]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/20]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date17740255.907.07.2017
[2019/20]
WO2017US41019
Priority number, dateUS201662359793P08.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662359793 P
[2019/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018009744
Date:11.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3481926
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C10M107/24, A61Q9/02
[2019/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
TitleGerman:SCHMIERELEMENTE FÜR RASIERKÖPFE MIT METATHESIERTEN UNGESÄTTIGTEN POLYOLEN[2019/20]
English:LUBRICATING MEMBER FOR RAZOR CARTRIDGES COMPRISING METATHESIZED UNSATURATED POLYOLS[2019/20]
French:ÉLÉMENT LUBRIFIANT POUR CARTOUCHES DE RASOIR COMPRENANT DES POLYOLS INSATURÉS AYANT SUBI UNE MÉTATHÈSE[2019/20]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
15.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2017011253  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [XP] 1-7,11,12 * examples 6, 7 *;
 [IDY]US2015105566  (COHEN STEVEN A [US], et al) [ID] 1-7,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 8-10;
 [IDY]US2014357714  (BRAKSMAYER DIZA PEARL [US], et al) [ID] 1-7,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 8-10;
 [Y]US2008060201  (KWIECIEN MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraph [0025] *
by applicantUS7121754
 US6298558
 US5711076
 US5134775
 US6301785
 US2009223057
 US2006225285
 WO2007031793
 US2014323374
 GB1299089
 US6442839
 US2007110703
 US2008060201
 US2013280174
 US5879584
 US2009220443
 US2013344012
 US2014357714
 US2010145086
 US7168173
 US7197825
 US6449849
 US6161288
 US7581318
 US7607230
 US7024776
 US2008034590
 US2009049695
 US7811553
 WO2008US09604
 WO2008US09635