Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3475446

EP3475446 - METHOD OF IDENTIFYING PEPTIDE EPITOPES, MOLECULES THAT BIND SUCH EPITOPES AND RELATED USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Juno Therapeutics, Inc.
400 Dexter Avenue North, Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
[2019/18]
Inventor(s)01 / TAREEN, Semih, U.
400 Dexter Ave. N
Suite 1200
Seattle, Washington 98109 / US
02 / SISSONS, James
400 Dexter Ave. N
Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
03 / FROHLICH, Mark
400 Dexter Ave. N
Suite 1200
Seattle, Washington 98109 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/18]01 / TAREEN, Semih, U.
307 Westlake Ave
North Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
02 / SISSONS, James
307 Westlake Ave
North Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
03 / FROHLICH, Mark
307 Westlake Ave
North Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/18]
Application number, filing date17740520.627.06.2017
[2019/18]
WO2017US39596
Priority number, dateUS201662355211P27.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662355211 P
[2019/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018005559
Date:04.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3475446
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018
[2019/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12N15/10, C12N15/869, G01N33/68
[2019/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/18]
Extension statesBA18.01.2019
ME18.01.2019
Validation statesMA18.01.2019
MD18.01.2019
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON PEPTIDEPITOPEN, MOLEKÜLE ZUR BINDUNG DERARTIGER EPITOPE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2019/18]
English:METHOD OF IDENTIFYING PEPTIDE EPITOPES, MOLECULES THAT BIND SUCH EPITOPES AND RELATED USES[2019/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'ÉPITOPES PEPTIDIQUES, MOLÉCULES QUI SE LIENT À DE TELS ÉPITOPES ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES[2019/18]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/18]
18.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2015143558  (BRITISH COLUMBIA CANCER AGENCY [CA]) [X] 89 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0091] * [Y] 1-81,88,90-114,138-140;
 [X]WO0067761  (UNIV WAKE FOREST [US], et al) [X] 89 * claim 76 * * page 35, line 15 - line 26 * * example 1 *;
 [Y]WO2014138209  (UNIV OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE [US]) [Y] 1-81,88,90-114,138-140 * page 11, line 14 - line 22 * * page 18, line 5 - line 8 * * page 29, line 14 - line 20 *
by applicantWO2014138209
 WO2016130693
 US7700350
 EP0277773
 US5830745
 US6713070
 US6692954
 US5721354
 US2009029755
 US6531127
 US5840306
 US2012308580
 US8361473
 US8722400
 US2014212446
 US6140081
 US6453242
 US6534261
 WO9853058
 WO9853059
 WO9853060
 WO0216536
 WO03016496
 US2011301073
 US5356802
 US5436150
 US5487994
 US5989565
 WO9420127
 WO9403205
 US5283173
 US5468614
 WO2006000830
 WO2006037960
 WO9613593
 WO9618105
 WO9918129
 WO2004033685
 WO2011044186
 US7569664
 WO9960120
 WO03020763
 US2007116690
 US2002150914
 US2003223994
 US2004191260
 US2006034850
 US2007092530
 US2009226474
 US2009304679
 WO03068201
 WO2010054007
 US4683195
 US4683202
 US6066457
 US6132997
 US5716785
 US5130238
 US5409818
 US5554517
 US5854033
 US6143495
 US5455166
 US5624825
 WO0070023
 US5223409
 WO9218619
 WO9117271
 WO9220791
 WO9215679
 WO9301288
 WO9201047
 WO9209690
 WO9002809
 WO0071694
 US5658727
 US5969108
 US5498531
 US5780272
 US2014294841
 US2015191524
 US2003100023
 US2003036092
 US6258558
 US6261804
 WO9831700
 US6385581
 WO0032823
 US6361943
 US7416847
 US6214553
 US6281344
 US6518018
 US6416950
 US7195880
 US6429300
 US9134304
 US2014113831
 US5643768
 US5658754
 WO9837186
 US6207446
 US4431546
 US4431544
 US4385991
 US4213860
 US4175182
 US3983001
 US5043062
 US5798208
 US5547835
 US5171534
 US5622824
 US5674743
 US4811218
 US5846727
 US5075216
 US5405746
 US5858671
 US5374527
 US5409811
 US5707804
 US5821058
 US6087095
 US5876934
 US6258533
 US5149625
 WO0014257
 WO2013126726
 WO2012129514
 WO2014031687
 WO2013166321
 WO2013071154
 WO2013123061
 US2002131960
 US2013287748
 US2013149337
 US6451995
 US7446190
 US8252592
 US8339645
 US8398282
 US7446179
 US6410319
 US7070995
 US7265209
 US7354762
 US7446191
 US8324353
 US8479118
 EP2537416
 WO2014055668
 US8389282
 US8822647
 US2014271635
 US8911993
 US4452773
 EP0452342
 US4795698
 US5200084
 WO2009072003
 US2011003380
 WO2010033140
 US6040177
 US5219740
 US6207453
 US4235871
 US4501728
 US4837028
 US5019369
 US2003170238
 US4690915
 US5087616
    - TYNAN et al., Nat. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 6, pages 1114 - 1122
    - SAMINO et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20060000), vol. 281, pages 6358 - 6365
    - BREDENBECK et al., J. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 174, pages 6716 - 6724
    - HOUSSEAU et al., J of Immunol., (19990000), vol. 163, pages 6330 - 6337
    - PIETRA et al., Journal of Biomedicine and Biotechnology, (20100000), pages 1 - 8
    - HANSEN et al., Science, (20130000), vol. 340, page 1237874
    - PIETRA et al., PNAS, (20030000), vol. 100, no. 19, pages 10896 - 10901
    - TOMASEC et al., Science, (20000000), vol. 287, no. 5455, pages 1031 - 1033
    - PROD'HOMME et al., 1 Immuno1, (20120000), vol. 188, no. 6, pages 2794 - 2804
    - LILJA et al., PNAS, (20080000), vol. 105, pages 19950 - 19955
    - SCHUESSLE et al., J. Virol., (20100000), vol. 84, page 9019
    - "Human herpesvirus 5 isolate 10J UL128 gene, complete cds.", Nucleotide, (20051016), Database accession no. DQ208272, URL: NCBI
    - "Human herpesvirus 5 isolate 12M UL130 gene, complete cds.", Nucleotide, (20051016), Database accession no. DQ208254, URL: ncbi
    - "Human herpesvirus 5 isolate 1M UL130 (UL130) gene, partial cds", Nucleotide, (20160726), Database accession no. DQ011966, URL: ncbi
    - PROD'HOMME et al., J Immunol., (20120000), vol. 188, no. 6, pages 2794 - 2804
    - "Human herpesvirus 5 isolate 01R003 UL40 (UL40) gene, complete cds", Nucleotide, (20130408), Database accession no. JQ060965, URL: ncbi
    - Nucleotide, (20160610), Database accession no. AH013698
    - "UL40 [Human betaherpesvirus 5]", Protein, (20160610), Database accession no. AAS48945, URL: ncbi
    - PENFOLD et al., J Virol. 203, vol. 77, no. 19, pages 10404 - 10413
    - "Human herpesvirus 5 genotype A1 US28 gene, partial cds", Nucleotide, (20021007), Database accession no. AF498083
    - "US28 [Human betaherpesvirus 5]", Protein, (20160610), Database accession no. AAS49025
    - "sequence differences confirmed in independent clones; variant of X17403 (AD169 strain), bases 219200 to 220263; G protein-coupled receptor [Human betaherpesvirus 5]", Protein, (19960502), Database accession no. AAA98741
    - AKTER et al., Journal of General Virology, (20030000), vol. 84, pages 1117 - 1122
    - HAHN et al., Journal of Virology, (20040000), vol. 78, pages 10023 - 10033
    - BRUNE et al., "Manipulating cytomegalovirus genomes by BAC mutagenesis: Strategies and applications", BRUNE et al., Matthias J. Reddehase,, Cytomegaloviruses: Molecular Biology and Immunology, Caister Academic Press, pages 61 - 69
    - MURPHY, E et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20030000), vol. 100, pages 14976 - 14981
    - "Human Herpesvirus 5 AD169-BAC isolate, complete sequence", Nucleotide, (20031210), Database accession no. AC146999, URL: ncbi
    - HAHN et al., J. Virol., (20040000), vol. 78, pages 10023 - 10033
    - WANG et al., PNAS, (20050000), vol. 102, pages 18153 - 18158
    - HAHN et al., Journal of Virology, (20040000), vol. 78, page 10023
    - MOCARSKI et al., PNAS, (19960000), vol. 93, page 11231
    - SPAETE; MOCARSKI, Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (19870000), vol. 84, pages 7213 - 17
    - BOON; OLD, Curr Opin Immunol, (19970000), vol. 9, pages 681 - 3
    - CHEEVER et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20090000), vol. 15, pages 5323 - 37
    - VAN DER BRUGGEN et al., Cancer Immun, (20130000), URL: www.cancerimmunity.org/peptide
    - ADDO et al., PLoS ONE, (20070000), vol. 2, page e321
    - TSOMIDES et al., J Exp Med, (19940000), vol. 180, pages 1283 - 93
    - UTZ et al., J Virol, (19960000), vol. 70, pages 843 - 51
    - ANIKEEVA et al., Clin Immunol, (20090000), vol. 130, pages 98 - 109
    - BULEK et al., Nat Immunol, (20120000), vol. 13, pages 283 - 9
    - HARKIOLAKI et al., Immunity, (20090000), vol. 30, pages 348 - 57
    - SKOWERA et al., J Clin Invest, (20080000), vol. 1, no. 18, pages 3390 - 402
    - BOECKH; BOIVIN, Clinical Microbiology Reviews, (19980000), vol. 11, pages 533 - 554
    - LANDRY et al., Antimircob. Agents Chemother., (20000000), vol. 44, pages 688 - 692
    - NEWMAN et al., J. Inf. Dis., (20030000), vol. 187, pages 1319 - 1322
    - BUTLER; HIRANO, Immunol Rev., (20140000), vol. 257, no. 1
    - SUHOSHKI et al., Mol. Ther., (20070000), vol. 15, pages 981 - 988
    - ADAMS et al., J. Transl. Med., (20040000), vol. 2, page 30
    - SMITH, Methods Mol Biol., (20120000), vol. 882, pages 67 - 86
    - SOLACHE et al., J Immunol, (19990000), vol. 163, pages 5512 - 5518
    - AMERES et al., PloS Pathog., (20130000), vol. 9, page el003383
    - KARAKIKES et al., FASEB J., (20120000), vol. 26, pages 4886 - 96
    - VOLPI et al., Journal of Cell Science, (20000000), vol. 113, pages 1565 - 1576
    - STRONG et al., J Biol Chem., (20030214), vol. 278, no. 7, pages 5082 - 90
    - DE KRUIJF et al., J Immunol., (20101215), vol. 185, no. 12, pages 7452 - 9
    - ROLLE et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20140000), vol. 124, pages 5305 - 5316
    - "Major histocompatibility complex, class I, E [Homo sapiens]", Protein, (20060715), Database accession no. AAH02578.1
    - "RecName: Full=HLA class I histocompatibility antigen, alpha chain E; AltName: Full=MHC class I antigen E; Flags: Precursor", Protein, (20170607), Database accession no. P13747.3
    - Nucleotide, (20060715), Database accession no. BC002578
    - Protein, (20170604), Database accession no. NP_005507
    - "Homo sapiens major histocompatibility complex, class I, E (HLA-E), mRNA", Nucleotide, (20170604), Database accession no. NM_005516.5
    - LEE et al., Journal of Immunology, (19980000), vol. 160, pages 4951 - 4960
    - BRAUD et al., Current Biology, (19980000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 10
    - GONZALEZ et al., Molecular Therapy, (20040000), vol. 11, pages 811 - 818
    - HAGA et al., Transplant Proc., (20060000), vol. 38, pages 3184 - 3188
    - FIGUEIREDO et al., J. Mol. Med., (20060000), vol. 84, pages 425 - 37
    - FIGUEIREDO et al., Transfusion, (20070000), vol. 47, pages 18 - 27
    - HACKE et al., Immunol. Res., (20090000), vol. 44, pages 112 - 126
    - LEMP et al., Clin. Transpl., (20130000), pages 93 - 101
    - SEE LLOYD et al., Fronteirs in Immunology, (20130000), vol. 4, no. 221, pages 1 - 7
    - LI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 4275 - 4279
    - LI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 2764 - 2768
    - KIM et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 883 - 887
    - KIM et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, pages 31,978 - 31,982
    - GAJ et al., Trends in Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 397 - 405
    - TORIKAI et al., Blood, (20130000), vol. 122, pages 1341 - 1349
    - SANDER; JOUNG, Nature Biotechnology, vol. 32, no. 4, pages 347 - 355
    - SANJANA et al., Nat. Methods, (20140000), vol. 11, pages 783 - 4
    - WANG et al., Science, (20140000), vol. 3, pages 343 - 80,4
    - TERRAZZANO et al., Journal of Immunology, (20070000), vol. 179, pages 372 - 381
    - FALK et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 351, page 290
    - "Biochemical Large-Scale Identification of Class I Ligands", KOWALEWSKI; STEVANOVIC, Antigen Processing: Methods and Protocols, Methods in Molecular Biology, (20130000), vol. 960, pages 145 - 157
    - HUNKAPILLER et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 310, pages 105 - 11
    - CEPPELLINI et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 339, page 392
    - CHRISTNICK et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, page 67
    - BUSCH et al., Int. Immunol., (19900000), vol. 2, page 443
    - HILL et al., J Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, page 189
    - DEL GUERCIO et al., J Immunol., (19950000), vol. 154, page 685
    - CERUNDOLO et al., J Immunol., (19910000), vol. 21, page 2069
    - HILL et al., J Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, page 2890
    - MARSHALL et al., J Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, page 4946
    - REAY et al., EMBO J, (19920000), vol. 11, page 2829
    - KHILKO et al., J Biol. Chem., (19930000), vol. 268, page 15425
    - HAMMER et al., J. Exp. Med., (19940000), vol. 180, page 2353
    - SYLVESTER-HYID et al., Tissue Antigens, (20020000), vol. 59, pages 251 - 8
    - STRONG et al., J Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 5082 - 5090
    - LJUNGGREN, H.-G. et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 346, pages 476 - 480
    - ZEH, H. J., III et al., Hum. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 39, pages 79 - 86
    - RIDDELL, S. R.; GREENBERG, P. D., J. Immunol. Methods, (19900000), vol. 128, pages 189 - 201
    - WALTER, E. A. et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (19950000), vol. 333, pages 1038 - 1044
    - ALEXANDER et al., Immunity, (19940000), vol. 1, pages 751 - 761
    - SCATCHARD et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19490000), vol. 51, page 660
    - WILSON, Science, (20020000), vol. 295, page 2103
    - WOLFF et al., Cancer Res., (19930000), vol. 53, page 2560
    - JORES et al., Proc. Nat'l Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19900000), vol. 87, page 9138
    - CHOTHIA et al., EMBO J., (19880000), vol. 7, page 3745
    - LEFRANC et al., Dev. Comp. Immunol., (20030000), vol. 27, page 55
    - KOTB, Clinical Microbiology Reviews, (19950000), vol. 8, pages 411 - 426
    - "The Immune System in Health and Disease", JANEWAY et al., Immunobiology, 3rd Ed.,, Current Biology Publications,, (19970000), vol. 33, page 4
    - LEFRANC et al., Developmental and Comparative Immunology, (20030000), vol. 2&, pages 55 - 77
    - SCHLUETER, C. J. et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19960000), vol. 256, page 859
    - DE FELIPE, Genetic Vaccines and Ther., (20040000), vol. 2, page 13
    - DEFELIPE et al., Traffic, (20040000), vol. 5, pages 616 - 626
    - NICHOLSON, Adv Hematol., (20120000), vol. 2012, page 404081
    - LI, Nat Med., (20100900), vol. 16, no. 9, pages 1029 - 34
    - OBENAUS, Nat Biotechnol., (20150400), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 402 - 7
    - HOLLER et al., Nat Immunol, (20030000), vol. 4, pages 55 - 62
    - HOLLER et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 5387 - 92
    - LI et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20050000), vol. 23, pages 349 - 54
    - CHERVIN et al., J Immunol Methods, (20080000), vol. 339, pages 175 - 84
    - KINDT et al., Kuby Immunology, 6th ed.,, W.H. Freeman and Co., (20070000), page 91
    - PORTOLANO et al., J. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 150, pages 880 - 887
    - CLARKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - ZHU; DIMITROV, Methods Mol Biol., (20090000), vol. 525, page 129
    - HUST et al., Methods in Molecular Biology, (20120000), vol. 907, pages 85 - 107
    - GRIFFITHS et al., EMBO Journal, (19930000), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 725 - 734
    - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - BERGTHORSDOTTIR et al., J. Immunol., (20010000), vol. 166, page 2228
    - DE HAARD et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, pages 18218 - 30
    - SAIKI et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 230, pages 1350 - 1354
    - SARKAR, Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 331 - 34
    - STOFLER et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 239, page 491
    - KNAPPIK et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20000000), vol. 296, pages 57 - 86
    - DENKBERG; REITER, Eur. J Immunol., (20000000), vol. 30, pages 3522 - 32
    - SMITH, G. P., Science, (19850000), vol. 228, pages 1315 - 1317
    - SCOTT; SMITH, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 386 - 90
    - SMITH, Science, (19850000), vol. 228, pages 1315 - 1317
    - DE HAARD et al., J. Biol. Chem, (19990000), vol. 274, pages 18218 - 30
    - HOOGENBOOM et al., Immunotechnology, (19980000), vol. 4, pages 1 - 20
    - HOOGENBOOM et al., Immunol Today, (20000000), vol. 2, pages 371 - 8
    - FUCHS et al., Bio/Technology, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 1370 - 1372
    - HAY et al., Hum Antibod Hybridomas, (19920000), vol. 3, pages 81 - 85
    - HUSE et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281
    - GRIFFITHS et al., EMBO J, (19930000), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734
    - HAWKINS et al., JMol Biol, (19920000), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896
    - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - GRAM et al., PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 3576 - 3580
    - GARRARD, Bio/Technology, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 1373 - 1377
    - REBAR et al., Methods Enzymol, (19960000), vol. 267, pages 129 - 49
    - HOOGENBOOM et al., Nuc Acid Res, (19910000), vol. 19, pages 4133 - 4137
    - BARBAS et al., PNAS, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982
    - SANTINI, J. Mol. Biol, (19980000), vol. 282, pages 125 - 135
    - ROSENBERG et al., Innovations, (19960000), vol. 6, pages 1 - 6
    - HOUSHMET, Anal Biochem, (19990000), vol. 268, pages 363 - 370
    - COHEN CJ et al., J Mol. Recogn., (20030000), vol. 16, pages 324 - 332
    - SAMI et al., Protein Eng Des Sel, (20070000), vol. 20, pages 397 - 403
    - VARELA-ROHENA et al., Nat Med, (20080000), vol. 14, pages 1390 - 5
    - BODER; WITTRUP, Nat. Biotechnol., (19970000), vol. 15, pages 553 - 557
    - BODER; WITTRUP, Nat. Biotech., (19970000), vol. 15, pages 553 - 557
    - BODER; WITTRUP, Methods Enzymol, (20000000), vol. 328, pages 430 - 44
    - AGGEN et al., Protein Engineering, Design, & Selection, (20110000), vol. 24, pages 361 - 72
    - KIEKE et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19990000), vol. 96, pages 5651 - 6
    - RICHMAN et al., Mol Immunol, (20090000), vol. 46, pages 902 - 16
    - WEBER et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20050000), vol. 102, pages 19033 - 8
    - FRANCISCO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. ScL, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 10444 - 10448
    - KIEKE et al., Prot. Eng., (19970000), vol. 10, pages 1303 - 1310
    - WEAVER-FELDHAUS et al., FEBS Lett., (20040000), vol. 564, pages 24 - 34
    - SWERS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20040000), vol. 32, page e36
    - HO et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, pages 07 - 617
    - KESSELS et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 14578 - 83
    - REIERSEN et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (20050000), vol. 33
    - ODEGRIP et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sd, U.S.A., (20040000), vol. 101, pages 2806 - 2810
    - ROBERTS; SZOSTAK, Proc Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 12297 - 12302
    - ROBERTS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci, (19970000), vol. 64, pages 12297 - 12302
    - LEUNG et al., Technique, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 11 - 15
    - STEMMER, Nature, (19940000), pages 389 - 391
    - COCO et al., Nature Biotech., (20010000), vol. 19, page 354
    - ZOOLER et al., Nucl Acids Res, (19870000), vol. 10, pages 6487 - 6504
    - REIDHAAR-OLSON, Methods Enzymol., (19910000), vol. 208, pages 564 - 586
    - GRIFFITHS et al., EMBO J., (19940000), vol. 13, page 3245
    - SADELAIN et al., Cancer Discov., (20130400), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 388 - 398
    - DAVILA et al., PLoS ONE, (20130000), vol. 8, no. 4, page e61338
    - TURTLE et al., Curr. Opin. Immunol., (20121000), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 633 - 39
    - WU et al., Cancer, (20120300), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 160 - 75
    - HUDECEK et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (20130000), vol. 19, page 3153
    - FEDOROV et al., Sci. Transl. Medicine,, (20131200), vol. 5, page 215
    - TERAKURA et al., Blood, (20120000), vol. 1, pages 72 - 82
    - WANG et al., J Immunother., (20120000), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 689 - 701
    - "Metastasis Research Protocols", Methods in Molecular Medicine, vol. 58
    - S. A. Brooks and U. Schumacher, Cell Behavior In Vitro and In Vivo, Humana Press Inc., vol. 2, pages 17 - 25
    - KLEBANOFF et al., J Immunother., (20120000), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 651 - 660
    - CHO et al., Lab Chip, (20100000), vol. 10, pages 1567 - 1573
    - GODIN et al., J Biophoton., (20080000), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 355 - 376
    - WIGLER et al., Cell, (19770000), vol. 2, page 223
    - MULLEN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19920000), vol. 89, page 33
    - CARLENS et al., Exp Hematol, (20000000), vol. 28, no. 10, pages 1137 - 46
    - ALONSO-CAMINO et al., Mol Ther Nucl Acids, (20130000), vol. 2, page e93
    - PARK et al., Trends Biotechnol., (20111129), vol. 11, pages 550 - 557
    - MILLER; ROSMAN, BioTechniques, (19890000), vol. 7, pages 980 - 990
    - MILLER, A. D., Human Gene Therapy, (19900000), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14
    - SCARPA et al., Virology, (19910000), vol. 180, pages 849 - 852
    - BURNS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 8033 - 8037
    - BORIS-LAWRIE; TEMIN, Cur. Opin. Genet. Develop., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 102 - 109
    - WANG et al., J. Immunother., (20120000), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 689 - 701
    - COOPER et al., Blood, (20030000), vol. 101, pages 1637 - 1644
    - VERHOEYEN et al., Methods Mol Biol., (20090000), vol. 506, pages 97 - 114
    - CAVALIERI et al., Blood., (20030000), vol. 102, no. 2, pages 497 - 505
    - CHICAYBAM et al., PLoS ONE, (20130000), vol. 8, no. 3, page e60298
    - VAN TEDELOO et al., Gene Therapy, (20000000), vol. 7, no. 16, pages 1431 - 1437
    - MANURI et al., Hum Gene Ther, (20100000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 427 - 437
    - SHARMA et al., Molec Ther Nucl Acids, (20130000), vol. 2, page e74
    - HUANG et al., Methods Mol Biol, (20090000), vol. 506, pages 115 - 126
    - ., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology,, John Wiley & Sons
    - JOHNSTON, Nature, (19900000), vol. 346, pages 776 - 777
    - BRASH et al., Mol. Cell Biol., (19870000), vol. 7, pages 2031 - 2034
    - LUPTON S. D. et al., Mol. and Cell Biol., (19910000), vol. 11, no. 6
    - RIDDELL et al., Human Gene Therapy, (19920000), vol. 3, pages 319 - 338
    - SZOKA et al., Ann. Rev. Biophys. Bioeng., (19800000), vol. 9, page 467
    - ROSENBERG, Nat Rev Clin Oncol., (20110000), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 577 - 85
    - THEMELI et al., Nat Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 31, no. 10, pages 928 - 933
    - TSUKAHARA et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20130000), vol. 438, no. 1, pages 84 - 9
    - KOCHENDERFER et al., J. Immunotherapy, (20090000), vol. 32, no. 7, pages 689 - 702
    - HERMAN et al., J. Immunological Methods, (20040000), vol. 285, no. 1, pages 25 - 40
    - WADWA et al., J. Drug Targeting, (19950000), vol. 3, page 1 1 1
 US20010326320
 WO1991US08442
 WO1994US05601