Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465222

EP3465222 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE NON-DESTRUCTIVE IN OVO DETERMINATION OF FOWL GENDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
In Ovo B.V.
Pesthuislaan 8
2333 BA Leiden / NL
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BRUINS, Wouter Sebastiaan
c/o Pesthuislaan 8
2333 BA Leiden / NL
02 / STUTTERHEIM, Wil Marijn
c/o Pesthuislaan 8
2333 BA Leiden / NL
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)HGF B.V.
Zuid-Hollandlaan 7
2596 AL Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Application number, filing date17740802.824.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017NL50330
Priority number, dateNL2016201681824.05.2016         Original published format: NL 2016818
NL2016201681924.05.2016         Original published format: NL 2016819
NL2016201738229.08.2016         Original published format: NL 2017382
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017204636
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3465222
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN IN-OVO-BESTIMMUNG DES GESCHLECHTS VON GEFLÜGEL[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE NON-DESTRUCTIVE IN OVO DETERMINATION OF FOWL GENDER[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA DÉTERMINATION IN OVO NON DESTRUCTRICE DU SEXE DE VOLAILLE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
03.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2013021715  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-18,32-34,36-39,54,55 * page 9 - page 11 * * page 6 * [A] 4,5;
 [A]WO9814781  (EMBREX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18,32-34,36-39,54,55 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2004016812  (ROSLIN INST EDINBURGH [GB], et al) [A] 1-18,32-34,36-39,54,55 * the whole document *;
 [T]WO2016000678  (TECH UNIVERSITÄT DRESDEN [DE], et al) [T] * the whole document *
by applicantWO2006124456
 WO2014021715
 US2007137577
 WO0022921
 WO9934667
 US2011144473
 US7950349
    - Y. FENG et al., Appl. Magn. Reson., (20070000), vol. 32, pages 257 - 268
    - GU D.-C. et al., Chinese Journal of Animal Science, vol. 7, pages 23 - 25
    - HAMBURGER, V; HAMILTON, HL, "A series of normal stages in the development of the chick embryo", Journal of Morphology, (19510000), vol. 88, no. 1, pages 49 - 92