Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469602

EP3469602 - MOISTURE-CURABLE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SILANE-GRAFTED POLYOLEFIN ELASTOMER AND HALOGEN-FREE FLAME RETARDANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies, LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
For all designated states
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Yichi
400 Arcola Road
Collegeville PA 19426 / US
02 / CHAUDHARY, Bharat, I.
400 Arcola Road
Collegeville PA 19426 / US
03 / HUGHES, Morgan, M.
708 Milton St.
Angleton TX 77515 / US
04 / YU, Xindi
400 Arcola Road
Collegeville PA 19426 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date17740815.008.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36493
Priority number, dateUS201662349828P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349828 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218280
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469602
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01B3/44, C08K5/54, H01B7/18, C08K3/22
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:FEUCHTIGKEITSHÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT SILANGEPFROPFTEM POLYOLEFINELASTOMER UND HALOGENFREIEM FLAMMHEMMER[2019/16]
English:MOISTURE-CURABLE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SILANE-GRAFTED POLYOLEFIN ELASTOMER AND HALOGEN-FREE FLAME RETARDANT[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS DURCISSABLES À L'HUMIDITÉ COMPRENANT UN ÉLASTOMÈRE DE POLYOLÉFINE GREFFÉ PAR UN SILANE ET UN IGNIFUGEANT EXEMPT D'HALOGÈNE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
04.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009042387  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0084]; table 9 *;
 [A]US2010163272  (INAGAKI TOMONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0126]; table 2 *;
 [A]US6048935  (PENFOLD JOHN [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 2.2; claims 1-14; tables 1-5 *;
 [A]US2015034359  (SUGITA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0069]; claims 1-8; tables 1-3 *
by applicantUS5741858
 US2006100385
 US8519054
 US4549041
 US2003013969
 US2010209705
 US3646155
 US6048935
 US4500648
 US4798081
 US5986028
 US5266627
 US4255303
 US5034442
 US7514489
 US2008251273
 WO2013116283
    - Rev. Macromol. Chem. Phys., vol. C29, no. 2&3, pages 285 - 297
    - WILD et al., "Journal of Polymer Science", Poly. Phys. Ed., (19820000), vol. 20, page 441
    - WILLIAMS; WARD, "Journal of Polymer Science", Polymer Letters, (19680000), vol. 6, no. 621