Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3405782

EP3405782 - INSPECTION DEVICES AND RELATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Innovation Systems, Inc.
4700 Nathan Lane
Plymouth, MN 55442 / US
[2019/08]
Former [2018/48]For all designated states
Orbital ATK, Inc.
4700 Nathan Lane
Plymouth, MN 55442 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PALMER, Jeremy D.
552 South 1025 West
Farmingon UT 84025 / US
02 / MELLUS, Ronald G.
720 West 3560 North
Erda UT 84074 / US
03 / OBA, Edwin Dean S.
5186 South Holladay Blvd.
Holladay UT 84117 / US
 [2018/48]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2018/48]
Application number, filing date17741767.211.01.2017
[2018/48]
WO2017US12924
Priority number, dateUS20161500092119.01.2016         Original published format: US201615000921
[2018/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017127264
Date:27.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3405782
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017
[2018/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.07.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/28, G10K11/02, G01N29/26, G01N29/22
[2019/35]
Former International [2018/48]G01N29/28, G10K11/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/48]
TitleGerman:PRÜFVORRICHTUNGEN SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN[2018/48]
English:INSPECTION DEVICES AND RELATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS[2018/48]
French:DISPOSITIFS D'INSPECTION ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2018/48]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2018National basic fee paid 
14.08.2018Search fee paid 
14.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/48]
11.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]CN103962890  (UNIV DALIAN TECH) [X] 1-10,12,16-18 * the whole document * [Y] 11;
 [X]US5001932  (LIGHT GLENN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10,12-14,16,17 * column 4, lines 28-40; figures 1-2 *;
 [X]US4726231  (TRETOUT HERVE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12,16-18 * column 7, line 27 - column 9, line 25; figure 2 *;
 [X]JPH0416758  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,10,13,14,16,17 * abstract *;
 [X]JPH02167467  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2,10,15-17,19 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP1882183  (GE INSPECTION TECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11 * abstract *
International search[XY]CN103962890  (UNIV DALIAN TECH) [X] 1-9, 12/1-12/9, 18, 19 * ; see machine translation * [Y] 10/1-10/9, 11/10/1-11/10/9, 13/1-13/9, 14/13/1-14/13/9, 15/1-15/9, 16/1-16/9, 17, 20/18, 20/19;
 [Y]US2010132597  (RIES DONALD [US]) [Y] 10/1-10/9, 11/10/1-11/10/9 * ; figure 2; paragraph [0027] *;
 [Y]US6315565  (SLOTKE NOEL [US], et al) [Y] 13/1-13/9, 14/13/1-14/13/9, 15/1-15/9 * ; figure 3; column 3, lines 45-55; column 4, lines 55-65; claim 14 *;
 [Y]US4986135  (CORSER GEORGE A [US], et al) [Y] 16/1-16/9, 20/18, 20/19 * ; figures 20, 21; column 5, lines 5-10; column 12, lines 20-45; claims 1, 18 *;
 [Y]JP2012107991  (IHI CORP) [Y] 17 * ; see machine translation *;
 [A]US5001932  (LIGHT GLENN M [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 10/1-10/9, 11/10/1-11/10/9, 12/1-12/9, 13/1-13/9, 14/13/1-14/13/9, 15/1-15/9, 16/1-16/9, 17-19, 20/18, 20/191-3 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US4726231  (TRETOUT HERVE [FR], et al) [A] 1-9, 10/1-10/9, 11/10/1-11/10/9, 12/1-12/9,13/1-13/9, 14/13/1-14/13/9, 15/1-15/9, 16/1-16/9, 17-19, 20/18, 20/19 * ; entire document *;
 [PX]CN105642491  (UNIV SHENYANG CHEMICAL TECH) [PX] 1 * ; entire document *