blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3491509

EP3491509 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DISPLAY APPARATUS FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, DISPLAY APPARATUS FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / CRAMER, Stephanie
Lörenskogstrasse 3
85748 Garching / DE
 [2019/23]
Application number, filing date17742187.206.07.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017EP67002
Priority number, dateDE20161021368726.07.2016         Original published format: DE102016213687
[2019/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018019544
Date:01.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3491509
Date:05.06.2019
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3491509
Date:13.05.2020
Language:DE
[2020/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/0489, B60K37/00, G06F3/0481, B60K37/02, G02B27/01, G02B27/64
[2019/23]
CPC:
G06F3/0481 (EP,US); B60K35/10 (EP,US); B60K35/23 (EP,US);
B60K35/29 (EP,US); B60K35/60 (EP,US); G02B27/01 (EP,US);
G02B27/0101 (US); G02B27/644 (EP,US); G06F3/04897 (EP,US);
B60K2360/149 (EP,US); B60K2360/18 (EP,US); B60K2360/188 (EP,US);
B60K2360/334 (EP,US); G02B2027/0141 (EP,US); G02B2027/0183 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0198 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2019/23]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DISPLAY APPARATUS FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, DISPLAY APPARATUS FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A DISPLAY APPARATUS[2019/23]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR ET VÉHICULE À MOTEUR ÉQUIPÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2019National basic fee paid 
26.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
26.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2020Fee for grant paid
25.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.07.2017
AL13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MK13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
IE06.07.2020
LU06.07.2020
BE31.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/27]HU06.07.2017
AL13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
IE06.07.2020
LU06.07.2020
BE31.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
IE06.07.2020
LU06.07.2020
BE31.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/20]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
IE06.07.2020
LU06.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/14]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS13.09.2020
Cited inInternational search[XAY]DE4338579  (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * the whole document * [A] 5 [Y] 2;
 [Y]DE10060536  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102007035505  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 8* the whole document *;
 [A]US2011001639  (SASAKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 5-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2015060193  (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 5-7 * figure 11 *;
 [XYI]WO2015159500  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0110]; figures 1-14 * [Y] 2,4,8 [I] 10;
 [YA]DE102015007485  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1,3-8,10-12;
 [YA]US2016147073  (ONDA KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1,3-8,10-12;
 [P]US2017038595  (KUTOMI SHINJI [JP])
by applicantDE19816647
 DE102009041205
 DE102015007485
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.