Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469198

EP3469198 - MOTOR COOLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Monza Tech S.r.l.
Via Azzone Visconti 43
20900 Monza / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BOZZANO, Francesco
11, Via Vittoria
20854 Vedano del Lambro (MB) / IT
02 / SIRTORI, Alessandro
16, Via Privata Schiatti
20854 Vedano del Lambro (MB) / IT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Baldi, Claudio
Ing. Claudio Baldi S.r.l.
Viale Cavallotti, 13
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17742450.426.07.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP68941
Priority number, dateIT2016007906027.07.2016         Original published format: IT201600079060
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018019914
Date:01.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469198
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:F01P7/16, F01P5/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBA08.01.2019
ME08.01.2019
Validation statesMA08.01.2019
MD08.01.2019
TitleGerman:MOTORKÜHLSYSTEM[2019/16]
English:MOTOR COOLING SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE MOTEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDI]US2011265742  (CHOI JAE YOUNG [KR] ET AL) [XD] 1,5 * paragraphs [0030] - [0057] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2-4,6-9;
 [I]US2016115858  (SELINGER MICHAEL [DE] ET AL) [I] 1-9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0557113  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,11 *;
 [A]US4580531  (N GUYEN HUU C [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,3 *;
 [AD]US6425353  (DAVIES RICHARD DAVID [AU]) [AD] 1-9 * figures 1-3 *
by applicantUS6425353
 US2011265742