Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469441

EP3469441 - AUTONOMOUSLY GUIDED MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique
Domaine de Voluceau
Rocquencourt
78150 Le Chesnay / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / VASQUEZ-GOVEA, Alejandro Dizan
420 James Road Apt 14
Palo Alto California 34306 / US
02 / MICHALCZYK, Jan
2 rue Hauquelin
38000 Grenoble / FR
03 / BORKOWSKI, Stanislas
84cité des Glières
38190 Brignoud / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Cabinet Netter
36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17742469.406.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017FR51427
Priority number, dateFR2016005551014.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655510
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216447
Date:21.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469441
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/02, G01S17/66
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AUTONOM GEFÜHRTE MASCHINE[2019/16]
English:AUTONOMOUSLY GUIDED MACHINE[2019/16]
French:MACHINE A GUIDAGE AUTONOME[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]ES2401509  (UNIV ALMERIA [ES]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014033055  (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2374228  (INSTRO PREC LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - Matej Mesko ET AL, "LASER SPOT DETECTION", Journal of Information, Control and Management Systems, (20130131), page 35, URL: http://stefantoth.com/content/papers/Mesko-Toth-LaserSpotDetection.pdf, (20170210), XP055345192 [A] 3-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - A. MOLDER ET AL, "Laser Line Detection with Sub-Pixel Accuracy", ELEKTRONIKA IR ELEKTROTECHNIKA - ELECTRONICS AND ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING, KAUNAS, LT, (20140519), vol. 20, no. 5, doi:10.5755/j01.eee.20.5.7114, ISSN 1392-1215, XP055345188 [A] 3-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5755/j01.eee.20.5.7114