Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3458367

EP3458367 - LABELING MACHINE, PRINTING MACHINE, INSPECTION MACHINE, AND METHOD FOR STARTING UP A BUS SYSTEM IN SUCH A MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstraße 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2019/13]
Inventor(s)01 / EGGL, Thomas
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
02 / TRIEBEL, Joerg
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
 [2019/13]
Representative(s)Schuhbießer, Irmgard Gertrud
Schuhbießer-Patent
Holzgartenstraße 6
93059 Regensburg / DE
[2019/13]
Application number, filing date17742662.404.07.2017
[2019/13]
WO2017EP66697
Priority number, dateDE20161012426613.12.2016         Original published format: DE102016124266
[2019/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018108331
Date:21.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3458367
Date:27.03.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65C9/40, B41J3/407, B65B57/00, B65B59/00, B67C3/00, G01N21/90, G05B19/042, G05B19/418
[2019/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ETIKETTIERMASCHINE, DRUCKMASCHINE, INSPEKTIONSMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR INBETRIEBNAHME EINES BUSSYSTEMS IN EINER SOLCHEN MASCHINE[2019/13]
English:LABELING MACHINE, PRINTING MACHINE, INSPECTION MACHINE, AND METHOD FOR STARTING UP A BUS SYSTEM IN SUCH A MACHINE[2019/13]
French:MACHINE D'ÉTIQUETAGE, MACHINE D'IMPRESSION, MACHINE D'INSPECTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN SERVICE D'UN SYSTÈME DE BUS DANS UNE TELLE MACHINE[2019/13]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/13]
18.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2009171489  (KRAMER KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0046] , [0051] - [0064] *;
 [Y]WO2012016771  (KRONES AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * * page 11, line 28 - page 17, line 19 *;
 [Y]US2008083504  (ZACCHE VANNI [IT], et al) [Y] 1,4-12 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] - [0042] *;
 [Y]US2001005968  (MILLS PAUL [GB]) [Y] 2,4-12 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0028] - [0038] *;
 [Y]DE102015106013  (KRONES AG [DE]) [Y] 3-12 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0052] *;
 [Y]EP2735538  (SIDEL SPA CON SOCIO UNICO [IT]) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] - [0032] *;
 [Y]EP1320222  (AMI SEMICONDUCTOR BELGIUM BVBA [BE]) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0035] *;
 [Y]DE19935192  (MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 7 - column 5, line 34 *;
 [Y]US2012221755  (SCHULTZ KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] - [0050] - [0068] *;
 [Y]DE102004043197  (LEHMANN ERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] * * figures 1-6 *
by applicantEP1596488
 DE202015100659U