blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3458367 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3458367



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 179
02.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
02.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
02.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
02.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
02.07.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
02.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
08.01.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 2
04.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.12.2018 Priority search results Search / examination 10
14.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.07.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
21.06.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.06.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.06.2018 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
17.10.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
17.10.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.10.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
08.08.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
27.07.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
04.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
04.07.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
04.07.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
04.07.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 20
04.07.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 1
04.07.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5
04.07.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4