blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3458367 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780049583 EP17742662



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109843731Global Dossier 04.06.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2017EP66697 04.07.2017
DE102016124266 13.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3458367Global Dossier 27.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2017EP66697 04.07.2017
DE102016124266 13.12.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2018108331Global Dossier 21.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
DE102016124266 13.12.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102016124266 14.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
DE102016124266 13.12.2016