Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468574

EP3468574 - NEW MEDICAL USE OF PROBIOTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOFAR S.p.A.
Via Firenze, 40
20060 Trezzano Rosa (MI) / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BIFFI, Andrea
Via Mulino Vecchio 146
24059 Urgnano (bergamo) / IT
02 / FIORE, Walter
Via Salita Montone 1
84010 Atrani (salerno) / IT
03 / ROSSI, Ruggero
Via Federico Engels 1
20153 MILANO / IT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle , et al
Hoffmann Eitle S.R.L.
Piazza Sigmund Freud 1
20154 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Biggi, Cristina , et al
Bugnion S.p.A.
Viale Lancetti 17
20158 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date17742849.708.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB53389
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0418808.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164188
[2019/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212433
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468574
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/745, A61K35/747, A61K36/064, A61P1/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBA31.10.2018
ME31.10.2018
Validation statesMA31.10.2018
MD31.10.2018
TitleGerman:NEUE MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG VON PROBIOTIKA[2019/16]
English:NEW MEDICAL USE OF PROBIOTICS[2019/16]
French:NOUVELLE UTILISATION MÉDICALE DE PROBIOTIQUES[2019/16]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase31.10.2018National basic fee paid 
31.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
31.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010008278  (NUTRICIA NV [NL]; KNOL JAN [NL]; BEN AMOR KAOUTHER [NL]; WIND RICHELE) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, lines 4-16 * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 35 * * page 10, lines 5-23 * * example - * * claim - * [Y] 1-10 [I] 1-10
 [XYI]  - Anonymous, "Effect of Lactobacillus Casei DG (Enterolactis Plus ) in Patient With Irritable Bowel Syndrome: a Pilot Study", ClinicalTrials.gov, (20150211), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT02371499, (20170125), XP055338992 [X] 1-10 * page 1 - page 3 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 1-10
 [XYI]  - Anonymous, "Efficacy Evaluation of a Commercial Preparation Containing Lactobacillus Casei DG on the Reduction of the Painful Symptoms Related to the Irritable Bowel Syndrome (IBS). A Pilot Clinical Study", ClinicalTrials.gov, (20140228), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/show/NCT02077699, (20170126), XP055339147 [X] 1-10 * page 1 - page 3 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 1-10
 [XYI]  - S. GUGLIELMETTI ET AL, "Randomised clinical trial: Bifidobacterium bifidum MIMBb75 significantly alleviates irritable bowel syndrome and improves quality of life -- a double-blind, placebo-controlled study", ALIMENTARY PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS., GB, (20110521), vol. 33, no. 10, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2036.2011.04633.x, ISSN 0269-2813, pages 1123 - 1132, XP055339014 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1124, column l, paragraph 1 - page 1131, column r, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2036.2011.04633.x
 [XYI]  - ROBIN SPILLER ET AL, "Randomized double blind placebo-controlled trial of Saccharomyces cerevisiae CNCM I-3856 in irritable bowel syndrome: improvement in abdominal pain and bloating in those with predominant constipation", UNITED EUROPEAN GASTROENTEROLOGY JOURNAL UEG WEEK 2015 ORAL PRESENTATIONS, (20150821), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1177/2050640615602571, ISSN 2050-6406, pages 353 - 362, XP055339155 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 353, column l, paragraph 1 - page 360, column r, paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/2050640615602571
 [XYI]  - SIEW CHIEN NG ET AL, "Effect of Probiotic Bacteria on the Intestinal Microbiota in Irritable Bowel Syndrome", JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY AND HEPATOLOGY, AU, (20130923), doi:10.1111/jgh.12306, ISSN 0815-9319, pages n/a - n/a, XP055339165 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1624, column l, paragraph 1 - page 1630, column r, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jgh.12306