Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3417461

EP3417461 - A PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF 99TC FROM LIQUID INTERMEDIATE LEVEL WASTE OF SPENT FUEL REPROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 29.01.2020  [2020/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Secretary, Department Of Atomic Energy
Anushakti Bhawan
O.Y.C. Building
Chatrapati Shivaji Maharaj Marg
Mumbai - 400 001 / IN
[2018/52]
Inventor(s)01 / GOPALDAS SHAH, Jayesh
Process Development Division,
CDCFT, Building
Wip Complex
Head PSDD Office
Barc, Mumbai 400085 / IN
02 / PAHAN, Sumit
Process Development Division,
R. No. 211
Process Building
Wip
Barc, Mumbai 400085 / IN
03 / ANANTHANARAYANAN, Arvind
Process Development Division,
R. No. 211
Process Building
Wip
Barc, Mumbai 400085 / IN
 [2020/05]
Former [2018/52]01 / JAYESH, Gopaldas Shah
Process Development Divivison, CDDFT
Building, WIP Complex, Head PSDD Office
Barc, Mumbai 400085 / IN
02 / SUMIT, Pahan
Process Development Divivison, R.NO. 211
Process Building
Barc, Mumbai 400085 / IN
03 / ARVIND, Ananthanarayanan
Process Development Divivison
R.NO. 211 Process Building
WIP
Barc, Mumbai 400085 / IN
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[2018/52]
Application number, filing date17742862.009.05.2017
[2018/52]
WO2017IN50170
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018207195
Date:15.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3417461
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018
[2018/52]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3417461
Date:29.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:G21F9/04, G21F9/12, G21F9/16, G21F9/30
[2019/34]
Former International [2018/52]G21F9/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON 99TC AUS FLÜSSIGEM MITTELRADIOAKTIVEM ABFALL AUS DER KERNBRENNSTOFF-WIEDERAUFARBEITUNG[2019/34]
English:A PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF 99TC FROM LIQUID INTERMEDIATE LEVEL WASTE OF SPENT FUEL REPROCESSING[2018/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE 99TC DU DECHET LIQUIDE DE CATÉGORIE INTERMEDIAIRE ISSU DU RETRAITEMENT DE COMBUSTIBLE NUCLÉAIRE[2019/34]
Former [2018/52]VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON 99TC AUS FLÜSSIGEM MITTELAKTIVEM ABFALL AUS DER WIEDERAUFBEREITUNG VON ABGEBRANNTEN KERNBRENNSTOFFEN
Former [2018/52]PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DE 99TC À PARTIR DE DÉCHETS DE NIVEAU INTERMÉDIAIRE LIQUIDES DE RETRAITEMENT DE COMBUSTIBLE USÉ
Entry into regional phase29.05.2018National basic fee paid 
29.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/52]
29.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2019Fee for grant paid
17.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US6133498  (SINGH DILEEP [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 25 - column 7, line 12 *;
 [A]US2015348661  (WAGH ARUN S [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0004] - [0018] *;
 [A]WO2004077454  (CH2M HILL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0045] - [0055] *