Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468666

EP3468666 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HIGH DOSE PER PULSE RADIOTHERAPY WITH REAL TIME IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fyzikální ústav AV CR, v.v.i.
Na Slovance 1999/2
18221 Praha 8 / CZ
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GRITTANI, Gabriele Maria
Za Radnicí 835
25241 Dolni Brezany / CZ
02 / LEVATO, Tadzio
Za Radnicí 835
25241 Dolni Brezany / CZ
03 / LAZZARINI, Carlo Maria
Za Radnicí 835
25241 Dolni Brezany / CZ
04 / KORN, Georg
Za Radnicí 835
25241 Dolni Brezany / CZ
 [2019/16]
Application number, filing date17742938.809.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CZ50023
Priority number, dateLU2016009310210.06.2016         Original published format: LU 93102
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211331
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468666
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3468666
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR RADIOTHERAPIE MIT HOHER DOSIS PRO PULS MIT ECHTZEIT-BILDGEBUNG[2019/16]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HIGH DOSE PER PULSE RADIOTHERAPY WITH REAL TIME IMAGING[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE RADIOTHÉRAPIE PAR IMPULSIONS À DOSE ÉLEVÉE AVEC UNE IMAGERIE EN TEMPS RÉEL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2018National basic fee paid 
07.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
21.05.2019Fee for grant paid
21.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]AT03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/10]AT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/08]LT03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
NO03.10.2019
Former [2020/07]NL03.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US2015124930  (VERHAEGEN FRANS [BE], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]US2012294423  (CHEUNG STEPHEN WAH-KWAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0115] - [0121] *;
 [A]US2015157879  (WU XIAODONG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] *
 [A]  - LE GARREC BRUNO ET AL, "ELI-beamlines: extreme light infrastructure science and technology with ultra-intense lasers", OPTOMECHATRONIC MICRO/NANO DEVICES AND COMPONENTS III : 8 - 10 OCTOBER 2007, LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE , ISSN 0277-786X], SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASH, (20140225), vol. 8962, doi:10.1117/12.2039165, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 89620I - 89620I, XP060034292 [A] 1-20 * page 5, final sentence of first paragraph of section 2.5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2039165
by applicantUS9044604
 US8039819
    - S. FARSIU et al., "Statistical detection and imaging of objects hidden in turbid media using ballistic photons", Applied Optics, (20070000), vol. 46, no. 23, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.46.005805, XP001506962

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.46.005805