Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469265

EP3469265 - PORTABLE STOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  09.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Satterley, Sean
c/o The Table Top Cooking Company Ltd
Unit 37
Armstrong Road The Royal Arsenal
London SE18 6RS / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Aldridge, Christopher Simon
Mohun Aldridge Sykes Limited
12 Park Square East
Leeds LS1 2LF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Aldridge, Christopher Simon
Mohun Intellectual Property Limited
13/14 Park Place
Leeds LS1 2SJ / GB
Application number, filing date17745448.508.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB51669
Priority number, dateGB2016001018610.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610186
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212278
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469265
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F24C3/14
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:TRAGBARER OFEN[2019/16]
English:PORTABLE STOVE[2019/16]
French:RÉCHAUD PORTATIF[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]KR20140144825  (KIM GAB CHEOL [KR]; KWON CHIL SUNG [KR]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 22] * * figures 1, 2, 5 *;
 [Y]FR825296  (LOUIS MERMOZ) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 37 - page 1, line 41 * * page 1, line 51 - page 1, line 53 * * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 8 * * page 2, line 57 - page 2, line 59 * * page 2, line 64 - page 2, line 67 * * figures 1, 5, 8 * * page 1, line 6 - page 1, line 7 * * page 3, line 3 - page 3, line 7 *;
 [XY]KR200442415Y  (UNKNOWN) [X] 10 * figures 1, 3, 4 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 20] , [0 24] * [Y] 3;
 [A]CN2713332Y  (WANG YUPING [CN]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US5992407  (TSAI TIEN-SHEN [TW]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]KR20060090475  (JUNG YU JIN [KR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *