Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471939

EP3471939 - PROCESS FOR RECLAIMING SCRAP OR UNUSED EPOXY RESIN PREPREG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  09.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BANK, David H.
433 Building
Midland MI 48667 / US
02 / CHAUDHARY, Amit K.
433 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
03 / SUN, Xiaofei
433 Building
Midland MI 48667 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date17745542.507.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US36279
Priority number, dateUS201662352104P20.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352104 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017222815
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471939
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29B17/00, B29B17/04, B29K63/00, B29K101/10
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON SCHROTT ODER UNGEBRAUCHTEM EPOXIDHARZ-PREPREG[2019/17]
English:PROCESS FOR RECLAIMING SCRAP OR UNUSED EPOXY RESIN PREPREG[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE DÉCHETS OU DE PRÉIMPRÉGNÉ DE RÉSINE ÉPOXY NON UTILISÉE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2018National basic fee paid 
13.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
13.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE3744728  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * claims 1-2 * * column 2, line 12 - line 30 * [I] 2,4,6,8-10;
 [XAI]DE3717277  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) [X] 1,3,7 * claims 1-5 * [A] 2,4 [I] 6,8-10;
 [A]DE19743545  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-9 *;
 [A]WO8909123  (BLATCHFORD & SONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-13 *;
 [A]JP2002302914  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] - [ 0021] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026]; examples 1-3 * * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]US5075057  (HOEDL HERBERT K [CA]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-16 *
by applicantUS2015151454
    - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology 3rd Ed., vol. 9, pages 267 - 289