Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472121

EP3472121 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TURBOMACHINE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.02.2020
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  09.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Safran Aircraft Engines
2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
SAFRAN
2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
5, Rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université Claude Bernard Lyon 1
43 Boulevard du 11 Novembre 1918
69622 Villeurbanne / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / POTELLE, Amélie
c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR
02 / BENAMARA, Omar
51 Avenue Viviani
69008 Lyon / FR
03 / LEBBOU, Kheirreddine
14 Avenue Roberto Rossellini
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
04 / PODGORSKI, Michaël
c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17745784.314.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017FR51531
Priority number, dateFR2016005554015.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655540
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216481
Date:21.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472121
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3472121
Date:25.03.2020
Language:FR
[2020/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/107, B32B9/00, C04B35/109, C03B15/00, F01D5/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER TURBOMASCHINENKOMPONENTE[2019/17]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TURBOMACHINE COMPONENT[2019/17]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIECE DE TURBOMACHINE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
11.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2020Fee for grant paid
14.02.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5573862  (GUALTIERI DEVLIN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 26 *;
 [A]WO9504013  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 1 *
 [Y]  - BELOUET ET AL, "About the crystalline perfection of Nd-doped YAG single crystals", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0022-0248(72)90118-2, ISSN 0022-0248, (19720801), pages 188 - 194, (19720801), XP024429512 [Y] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(72)90118-2
 [Y]  - BENAMARA OMAR ET AL, "Microstructure and crystallography of Al2O3-Y3Al5O12-ZrO2ternary eutectic oxide grown by the micropulling down t", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, (20150726), vol. 429, doi:10.1016/J.JCRYSGRO.2015.07.020, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 27 - 34, XP029273018 [Y] 4 * pages 27-28 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrysgro.2015.07.020