Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472503

EP3472503 - A CONNECTOR FOR THE RECIPROCAL CONNECTION OF AN END MEMBER OF A WATER SUPPLY OR A SPRAYER AND A FLEXIBLE HOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  09.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FITT S.p.A
Via Piave 8
36066 Sandrigo (Vicenza) / IT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / AMADEI, Marco
c/o Fitt S.p.A.
Via Piave 8
36066 Sandrigo (VI) / IT
02 / PICCOLI, Giuseppe
c/o Fitt S.p.A.
Via Piave 8
36066 Sandrigo (VI) / IT
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Autuori, Angelo
Eureka IP Consulting
Via Monte Cengio, 32
36100 Vicenza / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17745865.015.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IB53560
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0438415.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164384
IT2016UA0438515.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164385
[2019/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216750
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472503
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16L33/22, F16L11/12, F16L29/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERBINDER ZUR GEGENSEITIGEN VERBINDUNG EINES ENDTEILS EINER WASSERVERSORGUNG ODER EINER SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM FLEXIBLEN SCHLAUCH[2019/17]
English:A CONNECTOR FOR THE RECIPROCAL CONNECTION OF AN END MEMBER OF A WATER SUPPLY OR A SPRAYER AND A FLEXIBLE HOSE[2019/17]
French:CONNECTEUR POUR LA CONNEXION RÉCIPROQUE D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'EXTRÉMITÉ D'UNE ALIMENTATION EN EAU OU D'UN PULVÉRISATEUR ET D'UN TUYAU FLEXIBLE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
15.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE202015100073U  (SHANGHAI Q MALL & CO [CN], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9-19,21-27,30,32,35,37-39,42,45 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figure -; claims 2, 7 * [Y] 20 [I] 2,3,28,29,31,33,34,36,40-44;
 [XY]EP0875711  (UNIFLEX UTILTIME SPA [IT]) [X] 1,7,8,12,14-16 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line l; figure - * [Y] 20;
 [XI]FR2468826  (CAPRI CODEC SA [FR]) [X] 1,12,13 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 6; figure 4 * * page 3, line l - page 4, line 3; figures 1-3 * [I] 14-16;
 [A]WO2011161576  (FITT SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,17 * page 3, line 14 - line 16; figure - *;
 [A]WO2012014122  (FITT SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,17 * figure - *