Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471543

EP3471543 - METHOD AND KIT FOR DETERMINING PERACETIC ACID CONCENTRATION IN DISINFECTANT SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lonza Inc.
412 Mt. Kemble Avenue, Suite 200S
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[2019/21]
Former [2019/17]For all designated states
Lonza Inc.
412 Mt. Kemble Avenue, Suite 2005
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JANG, Steven
412 Mt. Kemble Avenue, Suite 200S
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
02 / BRIEN, Richard
412 Mt. Kemble, Suite 200S
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
03 / LU, Kaifeng
Lane 333, Laifang Road
Shanghai, Songjiang District / CN
04 / JI, Yongcheng
10 Harrogate Circle
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]01 / JANG, Steven
412 Mt. Kemble Avenue, Suite 200S
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
02 / BRIEN, Richard
412 Mt. Kemble, Suite 200S
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
03 / LU, Kaifeng
12 Mt. Kemble Avenue, Suite 200S
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
04 / JI, Yongcheng
12 Mt. Kemble Avenue, Suite 200S
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
Representative(s)Greiner, Elisabeth
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17746302.320.07.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US43031
Priority number, dateUS201662364947P21.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662364947 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018017809
Date:25.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471543
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A01N37/16, G01N31/22, A01P1/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER PERESSIGSÄUREKONZENTRATION IN DESINFEKTIONSLÖSUNGEN[2019/17]
English:METHOD AND KIT FOR DETERMINING PERACETIC ACID CONCENTRATION IN DISINFECTANT SOLUTIONS[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET KIT PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LA CONCENTRATION EN ACIDE PERACÉTIQUE DANS DES SOLUTIONS DÉSINFECTANTES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
21.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IY]US5906916  (WU WEN H [US]) [I] 1-23 * the claims; column 13, lines 29-67; column 14 and column 15, lines 1-53 * [Y] 1-23;
 [IY]US4900682  (FISCHER WOLFGANG [DE] ET AL) [I] 1-23 * the claims; column 1, lines 48-68; column 2; column 3, lines 8-41 and the examples * [Y] 1-23;
 [Y]US2013259957  (DAGHER FADI [CA] ET AL) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs 29-34, 50-53 and 215-217 *;
 [Y]  - RUTALA ET AL, "Comparative evaluation of the sporicidal activity of new low-temperature sterilization technologies: Ethylene oxide, 2 plasma sterilization systems, and liquid peracetic acid", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF INFECTION CONT, C.V. MOSBY CO., ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (19980801), vol. 26, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0196-6553(98)70034-3, ISSN 0196-6553, pages 393 - 398, XP005697672 [Y] 1-23 * the abstract; page 2, right column, last line and page 3, left column, first paragraph *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0196-6553(98)70034-3
 [Y]  - Micro Essential Laboratory Inc., "Hydrion Peracetic Acid (PAA) Test Strips, 0-160 PPM", (20130101), URL: https://www.microessentiallab.com/uploads/media/2014%20Lit/paa_lit.pdf, (20170905), XP055403931 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - Minntech Corporation, "Perassay 500 peracetic acid test strips-78378-000", (20100101), URL: http://www.medivators.com/sites/default/files/minntech/documents/Perassay500IFU.pdf, (20170905), XP055403937 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document *