blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3494135

EP3494135 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TARGETING GLYPICAN-2 (GPC2) AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2020
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2023New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The United States of America, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services
National Institutes of Health
Office of Technology Transfer
6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325
MSC 7660
Bethesda, MD 20852-7660 / US
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / HO, Mitchell
4009 Tottenham Court
Urbana, MD 21704 / US
02 / LI, Nan
c/o National Institutes of Health/NCI
Bld. 37 Room 5002
Bethesda, MD 20892 / US
03 / DIMITROV, Dimiter, S.
1019 Storrington Drive
Frederick, MD 21702 / US
 [2019/24]
Representative(s)Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Straße 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/24]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date17746316.320.07.2017
[2019/24]
WO2017US43112
Priority number, dateUS201662369861P02.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662369861 P
[2019/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018026533
Date:08.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3494135
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/18, C07K16/30, C12N15/113, A61K47/68, A61P35/00, A61K39/00
[2019/24]
CPC:
C07K16/18 (EP); C07K16/3053 (US); A61K47/6415 (US);
A61K47/6851 (EP); A61K47/6929 (US); A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/2809 (US); C07K16/30 (EP); C07K7/08 (US);
C12N15/1138 (EP); A61K2039/505 (EP); C07K2317/21 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP); C07K2317/569 (EP); C07K2317/73 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP); C12N2310/20 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
TitleGerman:GEGEN GLYPICAN-2 (GPC2) GERICHTETE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/24]
English:MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TARGETING GLYPICAN-2 (GPC2) AND USE THEREOF[2019/24]
French:ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX CIBLANT LE GLYPICAN-2 (GPC2) ET LEUR UTILISATION[2019/24]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2019National basic fee paid 
14.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
14.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.03.2020Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
24.03.2020Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
08.07.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.11.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YP]WO2017083296  (THE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PHILADELPHIA [US], et al) [YP] 1-50 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - RIMAS J. ORENTAS ET AL, "Identification of Cell Surface Proteins as Potential Immunotherapy Targets in 12 Pediatric Cancers", FRONTIERS IN ONCOLOGY, (20120101), vol. 2, doi:10.3389/fonc.2012.00194, XP055127272 [Y] 1-50 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fonc.2012.00194
 [Y]  - CHEN W ET AL, "Construction of a Large Phage-Displayed Human Antibody Domain Library with a Scaffold Based On a Newly Identified Highly Soluble, Stable Heavy Chain Variable Domain", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 382, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2008.07.054, ISSN 0022-2836, (20081010), pages 779 - 789, (20080726), XP025610000 [Y] 1-50 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2008.07.054
 [YP]  - JOHN D. HEWES, "Human Monoclonal Antibodies Targeting Glypican-2 in Neuroblastoma", FEDERAL REGISTER, (20160816), vol. 81, no. 158, pages 54583 - 54584, XP055380988 [YP] 1-50 * page 54583 *
 [T]  - NAN LI ET AL, "Therapeutically targeting glypican-2 via single-domain antibody-based chimeric antigen receptors and immunotoxins in neuroblastoma", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20170724), vol. 114, no. 32, doi:10.1073/pnas.1706055114, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E6623 - E6631, XP055404734 [T] 1-50 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1706055114
by applicantUS3896111
 US4137230
 US4151042
 US4235871
 US4248870
 US4256746
 US4260608
 US4265814
 US4294757
 US4307016
 US4308268
 US4308269
 US4309428
 US4313946
 US4315929
 US4317821
 US4322348
 US4331598
 US4361650
 US4362663
 US4364866
 US4371533
 US4424219
 US4450254
 US4501728
 US4689401
 US4837028
 US4892827
 US4902505
 US4957735
 US5004697
 US5019369
 US5055303
 US5061620
 US5079163
 US5188837
 US5208020
 US5254342
 US5268164
 US5271961
 US5413797
 US5506206
 US5512658
 US5514670
 US5534496
 US5602095
 US5608039
 US5635483
 US5663149
 US5712374
 US5714586
 US5739116
 US5767237
 US5767285
 US5780588
 US5821238
 US5854044
 WO9951643
 US6124431
 US6884799
 WO2005052006
 US2006084162
 US7049311
 US7067511
 WO2007016150
 WO2007014743
 WO2007031741
 US7265105
 US2007258986
 WO2009016516
 US2009036431
 WO2009032954
 US7511032
 US7528126
 US7557099
 US2009304710
 US2010047257
 US2010203007
 US2010329981
 WO2011032022
 US2011256157
 WO2011130598
 US2011268655
 WO2012154530
 WO2012170617
 US2013129753
 WO2014052064
 US2015099707
    - MARIS; HOGARTY, Lancet, (20070000), vol. 369, pages 2106 - 2120
    - YU et al., New Engl J Med, (20100000), vol. 363, pages 1324 - 1334
    - MATTHAY et al., New Engl J Med, (19990000), vol. 341, pages 1165 - 1173
    - ORENTAS et al., Front Oncol, (20120000), vol. 2, page 194
    - FILMUS et al., Genome Biol, (20080000), vol. 9, page 224
    - STIPP et al., J Cell Biol, (19940000), vol. 124, pages 149 - 160
    - PASTAN et al., Nat Rev Cancer, (20060000), vol. 6, pages 559 - 565
    - KREITMAN et al., J Clin Oncol, (20090000), vol. 27, pages 2983 - 2990
    - HASSAN et al., Sci Transl Med, (20130000), vol. 5, page 208ra147
    - HASSAN et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20140000), vol. 20, pages 5927 - 5936
    - KREITMAN; PASTAN, Clin Cancer Res, (20110000), vol. 17, pages 6398 - 6405
    - KOCHENDERFER et al., Blood, (20120000), vol. 119, pages 2709 - 2720
    - KOCHENDERFER; ROSENBERG, Nat Rev Clin Oncol, (20130000), vol. 10, pages 267 - 276
    - PORTER et al., New Engl J Med, (20110000), vol. 365, pages 725 - 733
    - MAUDE et al., New Engl J Med, (20140000), vol. 371, pages 1507 - 1517
    - GRUPP et al., New Engl J Med, (20130000), vol. 368, pages 1509 - 1518
    - POLAKIS, Pharmacol Rev, vol. 68, no. 1, pages 3 - 19,2016
    - WEIDLE et al., Semin Oncol, (20140000), vol. 41, no. 5, pages 653 - 660
    - FAN et al., J Hematol Oncol, (20150000), vol. 8, page 130
    - TAIPALE; BEACHY, Nature, (20010000), vol. 411, pages 349 - 354
    - CLEVERS; NUSSE, Cell, (20120000), vol. 149, pages 1192 - 1205
    - CHENN; WALSH, Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 365 - 369
    - LEE et al., Science, (20040000), vol. 303, pages 1020 - 1023
    - ZECHNER et al., Dev Biol, (20030000), vol. 258, pages 406 - 418
    - CAPURRO et al., Cancer Res, (20050000), vol. 65, pages 6245 - 6254
    - GAO et al., Hepatology, (20140000), vol. 60, pages 576 - 587
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J Mol Biol, (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - CHOTHIA et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 342, page 877
    - AL-LAZIKANI et al., JMB, (19970000), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948
    - LEFRANC, Nucleic Acids Res, (20010000), vol. 29, pages 207 - 9
    - FRANKEL et al., Mol. Immunol., (19790000), vol. 16, pages 101 - 106
    - SLAPAK; KUFE, Principles of Cancer Therapy, Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine
    - CONNOR et al., Pharm Ther, (19850000), vol. 28, pages 341 - 365
    - GERRATANA, Med Res Rev, (20120000), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 254 - 293
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444
    - HIGGINS; SHARP, Gene, (19880000), vol. 73, page 237
    - HIGGINS; SHARP, CABIOS, (19890000), vol. 5, page 151
    - CORPET et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19880000), vol. 16, page 10881
    - ALTSCHUL et al., Nature Genet., (19940000), vol. 6, page 119
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, page 403
    - SIEGALL et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, pages 14256 - 14261
    - PAI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 3358 - 3362
    - KONDO et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19880000), vol. 263, pages 9470 - 9475
    - PASTAN et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19970000), vol. 1333, pages C1 - C6
    - WELDON et al., Blood, (20090000), vol. 113, no. 16, pages 3792 - 3800
    - ONDA et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20080000), vol. 105, no. 32, pages 11311 - 11316
    - CONNOR et al., Pharm. Ther., (19850000), vol. 28, pages 341 - 365
    - CARTELLIERI et al., J Biomed Biotechnol, (20100000), vol. 2010, page 956304
    - DAI et al., J Natl Cancer Inst, (20160000), vol. 108, no. 7, page djv439
    - PARK et al., Mol Ther, (20070000), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 825 - 833
    - RODGERS et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20160000), vol. 113, no. 4, pages E459 - E468
    - BANDER, Clinical Advances in Hematology & Oncology, (20120000), vol. 10, no. 8, pages 3 - 7
    - QASBA et al., Biotechnol Prog, (20080000), vol. 24, pages 520 - 526
    - LEIMGRUBER et al., JAm Chem Soc, (19650000), vol. 87, pages 5793 - 5795
    - LEIMGRUBER et al., J Am Chem Soc, (19650000), vol. 87, pages 5791 - 5793
    - WOYKE et al., Antimicrob Agents and Chemother, (20010000), vol. 45, no. 12, pages 3580 - 3584
    - PETTIT et al., Antimicrob Agents Chemother, (19980000), vol. 42, pages 2961 - 2965
    - HINMAN et al., Cancer Res, (19930000), vol. 53, pages 3336 - 3342
    - LODE et al., Cancer Res, (19980000), vol. 58, pages 2925 - 2928
    - QUINTIERI et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20050000), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 1608 - 1617
    - GRANDI et al., Cancer Treat Rev, (19900000), vol. 17, page 133
    - RIPAMONTI et al., Br J Cancer, (19920000), vol. 65, pages 703 - 707
    - CHARI et al., Cancer Res, (19920000), vol. 52, pages 127 - 131
    - FAY; SCOTT, Immunotherapy, (20110000), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 381 - 394
    - PASZKO; SENGE, Curr Med Chem, (20120000), vol. 19, no. 31, pages 5239 - 5277
    - IMMORDINO et al., Int J Nanomedicine, (20060000), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 297 - 315
    - KREUTER, J., Colloidal Drug Delivery Systems, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19940000), pages 219 - 342
    - TICE; TABIBI, Treatise on Controlled Drug Delivery, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19920000), pages 315 - 339
    - LANGER, Accounts Chem. Res., (19930000), vol. 26, pages 537 - 542
    - JOHNSTON et al., Pharm. Res., (19920000), vol. 9, pages 425 - 434
    - PEC et al., J. Parent. Sci. Tech., (19900000), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 58 - 65
    - IJNTEMA et al., Int. J. Pharm., (19940000), vol. 112, pages 215 - 224
    - DAY, Pigment Cell Melanoma Res, (20090000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 283 - 295
    - CHEN et al., J Mol Biol, (20080000), vol. 382, pages 779 - 789
    - HO; PASTAN, Methods Mol Biol, (20090000), vol. 525, pages 293 - 308
    - HO et al., J Biol Chem, (20050000), vol. 280, pages 607 - 617
    - FENG et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20130000), vol. 110, pages E1083 - E1091
    - FENG et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20130000), vol. 110, pages E1083 - 1091
    - MAUS; JUNE, Clin Cancer Res, (20160000), vol. 22, no. 8, pages 1875 - 1884
    - SANJANA et al., Nat Methods, (20140000), vol. 11, pages 783 - 784
    - SHALEM et al., Science, (20140000), vol. 343, pages 84 - 87
    - GAO, Nat Commun, (20150000), vol. 6, page 6536
    - HARA et al., Br J Cancer, (20160000), vol. 115, no. 1, pages 66 - 75
    - "Herreros-Villanueva and Bujanda", Ann Transl Med, (20160000), vol. 4, no. 4, page 64
    - SHIRAKAWA et al., Cancer Sci, (20090000), vol. 100, no. 8, pages 1403 - 1407
    - GAO et al., Hepatology, (20140000), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 576 - 587
    - MARIS et al., Lancet, (20070000), vol. 369, no. 9579, pages 2106 - 2120
    - SHU et al., Dev Biol, (20050000), vol. 283, no. 1, pages 226 - 239
    - TEN BERGE et al., Development, (20080000), vol. 135, no. 19, pages 3247 - 3257
    - CHEUNG et al., J Clin Oncol, (20120000), vol. 30, pages 3264 - 3270
    - HANDGRETINGER et al., Eur J Cancer, (19950000), vol. 21A, no. 2, pages 261 - 267
    - YU et al., J Clin Oncol, (19980000), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 2169 - 2180
    - DE CALISTO et al., Development, (20050000), vol. 132, no. 11, pages 2587 - 2597
    - WAI et al., Int J Oncol, (20020000), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 441 - 451
    - COLOMBRES et al., J Cell Physiol, (20080000), vol. 216, pages 805 - 815
    - LIU et al., Oncogene, (20080000), vol. 27, pages 1478 - 1488
    - BRODEUR; SEEGER, Cancer Genet Cytogenet, (19860000), vol. 19, no. 1-2, pages 101 - 111
    - BRODEUR et al., Science, (19840000), vol. 224, no. 4653, pages 1121 - 1124
    - SEEGER et al., New Engl J Med, (19850000), vol. 313, no. 18, pages 1111 - 1116
    - DE GENST et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20060000), vol. 103, pages 4586 - 4591
    - STANFIELD et al., Science, (20040000), vol. 305, pages 1770 - 1773
    - GAO et al., Nat Commun, (20150000), vol. 6, page 6536
    - MAZOR et al., Immunol Rev, (20160000), vol. 270, no. 1, pages 152 - 164
    - STERMAN et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20070000), vol. 13, pages 4456 - 4466
    - MAUS et al., Blood, (20140000), vol. 123, pages 2625 - 2635
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.