Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3355654

EP3355654 - METHOD OF RECOVERING UE CONTEXT INFORMATION, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2018/31]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Jing
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / GAO, Yin
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2018/31]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/31]
Application number, filing date17746873.323.01.2017
[2018/31]
WO2017CN72277
Priority number, dateCN2016107952104.02.2016         Original published format: CN201610079521
[2018/31]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017133553
Date:10.08.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3355654
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN10.08.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/19, // H04W76/27, H04W92/14
[2019/24]
Former International [2018/31]H04W76/02, H04W76/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/31]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON BENUTZERVORRICHTUNGSKONTEXTINFORMATIONEN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM[2018/31]
English:METHOD OF RECOVERING UE CONTEXT INFORMATION, DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2018/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DES INFORMATIONS DE CONTEXTE D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME[2018/31]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2018Translation filed 
27.04.2018National basic fee paid 
27.04.2018Search fee paid 
27.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/31]
27.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.08.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]  - ERICSSON, "Bearer Admission at UE Context Resume", vol. RAN WG3, no. Budapest, HU; 20150120 - 20150122, (20160119), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-160095_NBIOT_ADMISSION_CONTROL_AT_RESUME, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20160119), XP051055994 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Introduction of the UE Context Resume function", vol. RAN WG3, no. Budapest, HU; 20160120 - 20160122, (20160122), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-160145, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_AHGs/R3_AHG_NB-IOT/Docs/, (20160122), XP051067142 [X] 1-15 * paragraph [8.3.x2] * * paragraph [9.1.4.x6] *
International search[A]CN101494845  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-31 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101489273  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-31 * , the whole document *;
 [A]EP2645806  (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA]) [A] 1-31 * , the whole document *
 [X]  - HUAWEI, "Introduction of User Plane Solution for NB-IoT", 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 ADHOC NB-IOT R3-160114, (20160122), XP051067109 [X] 1-31 * , sections 8.1, 8.3.x and 9.1.4.a to 9.1.4.c *
 [X]  - SAMSUNG, "The User plane CIOT Optimization", 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 #AD HOC R3-160029, (20160122), XP051067073 [X] 1-31 * , section 2.2, and figure 4 *