blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3494308

EP3494308 - TURBOMOLECULAR PUMP WITH LUBRICANT SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.11.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.12.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2024Change - divisional application(s)published on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill, Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / PERRINO, Nicola
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
 [2019/24]
Representative(s)Norton, Ian Andrew
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
[2024/14]
Former [2019/24]Norton, Ian Andrew
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill
West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
Application number, filing date17748904.431.07.2017
[2019/24]
WO2017GB52228
Priority number, dateGB2016001346404.08.2016         Original published format: GB 201613464
[2019/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018025023
Date:08.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3494308
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3494308
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:F04D29/063, F04D19/04, F16C33/66, F16N7/12, F16N7/36, F04D29/059
[2019/24]
CPC:
F04D19/042 (EP,CN,GB,US); F04D29/063 (EP,CN,US); F04D19/04 (US);
F04D29/002 (CN); F04D29/06 (GB); F16C33/66 (GB);
F16C33/6666 (EP,US); F16C33/6685 (EP,US); F16N7/12 (EP,US);
F16N7/18 (US); F16N7/366 (EP,US); F04D29/059 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP); F16C2360/45 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TURBOMOLEKULARPUMPE MIT SCHMIERMITTELVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM[2023/50]
English:TURBOMOLECULAR PUMP WITH LUBRICANT SUPPLY SYSTEM[2019/24]
French:POMPE TURBOMOLÉCULAIRE AVEC SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN LUBRIFIANT[2023/50]
Former [2019/24]TURBOMOLEKULARE PUMPE MIT SCHMIERMITTELVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM
Former [2019/24]POMPE TURBOMOLÉCULAIRE À SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN LUBRIFIANT
Entry into regional phase19.02.2019National basic fee paid 
19.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
19.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2024Fee for grant paid
27.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP24161567.3
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1477721  (PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0007] , [00 9] *[I] 5,7;
 [X]EP1921322  (PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] *;
 [XI]EP2600005  (PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-11,14,15 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0 29] * [I] 5,12,13;
 [XI]EP2728195  (PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-11,14,15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0040] * [I] 12,13;
 [XI]EP2740956  (PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,14,15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0 21] , [0 23] * [I] 5,7,12,13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.