Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472875

EP3472875 - REDUCING OR AVOIDING METAL DEPOSITION FROM ETCHING MAGNETIC TUNNEL JUNCTION (MTJ) DEVICES, INCLUDING MAGNETIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY (MRAM) DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
28.06.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Chando
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / KAN, Jimmy, Jianan
13532 Sydney Rae Place
San Diego, California 92129 / US
03 / KANG, Seung, Hyuk
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17748987.920.07.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US43021
Priority number, dateUS201662370929P04.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662370929 P
US20161524159519.08.2016         Original published format: US201615241595
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018026529
Date:08.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472875
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01L43/08, G11C11/16
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REDUZIERUNG ODER VERMEIDUNG VON METALLABSCHEIDUNGEN DURCH ÄTZEN VON MAGNETISCHEN TUNNELVERBINDUNG (MTJ) -VORRICHTUNGEN, EINSCHLIESSLICH MAGNETISCHER ZUFALLZUGRIFFSSPEICHER (MRAM)[2019/24]
English:REDUCING OR AVOIDING METAL DEPOSITION FROM ETCHING MAGNETIC TUNNEL JUNCTION (MTJ) DEVICES, INCLUDING MAGNETIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY (MRAM) DEVICES[2019/17]
French:RÉDUCTION OU PRÉVENTION DU DÉPÔT DE MÉTAL RÉSULTANT DE LA GRAVURE DE DISPOSITIFS À JONCTION À EFFET TUNNEL MAGNÉTIQUE (MTJ), Y COMPRIS DES DISPOSITIFS DE MÉMOIRE VIVE MAGNÉTIQUE (MRAM)[2019/17]
Former [2019/17]VERRINGERUNG ODER VERMEIDUNG VON METALLABSCHEIDUNG AUS DEM ÄTZEN VON MAGNETTUNNELÜBERGANGS (MTJ)-VORRICHTUNGEN, EINSCHLIESSLICH MAGNETISCHER DIREKTZUGRIFFSSPEICHER (MRAM)-VORRICHTUNGEN
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
16.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US9142762  (LI XIA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,14,17-21,23,26,29 * column 7, line 35 - column 9, line 19; figures 3b, 6a-6d, 7a-7i *