blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3490544

EP3490544 - MEMANTINE TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.07.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2024New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
30.01.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corium Pharma Solutions, Inc.
4558 50th Street SE
Grand Rapids, MI 49512 / US
[2023/13]
Former [2019/49]For all designated states
Corium, Inc.
235 Constitution Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
Former [2019/23]For all designated states
Corium International, Inc.
235 Constitution Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Eun Soo
2575 Hampton Avenue
Redwood City California 94061 / US
02 / SINGH, Parminder
5504 Alvelais Drive
Union City California 94587 / US
03 / SAGI, Appala
2025 California Street 42
Mountain View California 94040 / US
04 / JAIN, Amit K.
825 Carino Terrace
Milpitas California 95035 / US
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
3 Noble Street
London EC2V 7BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/23]D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date17749060.426.07.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017US44051
Priority number, dateUS201662367502P27.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662367502 P
US201662423133P16.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662423133 P
US201762444745P10.01.2017         Original published format: US 201762444745 P
US201762444763P10.01.2017         Original published format: US 201762444763 P
US201762457791P10.02.2017         Original published format: US 201762457791 P
US201762457794P10.02.2017         Original published format: US 201762457794 P
US201762504391P10.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762504391 P
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018022818
Date:01.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3490544
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/13, A61K9/70, A61P25/00, A61P25/28, A61P9/10
[2019/23]
CPC:
A61K9/7084 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/045 (EP,RU,US); A61K31/13 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/02 (KR); A61K47/10 (KR,RU); A61K47/32 (KR);
A61K47/58 (RU); A61K9/70 (RU); A61K9/7038 (US);
A61K9/7061 (EP,US); A61K9/7092 (EP,US); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR,RU); A61P9/10 (EP); A61K47/16 (US);
A61K9/0014 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
TitleGerman:TRANSDERMALE ABGABESYSTEME FÜR MEMANTIN[2019/23]
English:MEMANTINE TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS[2019/23]
French:SYSTÈMES D'ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE DE MÉMANTINE[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2019National basic fee paid 
27.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
27.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202307   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2024
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1423100  (TROMMSDORFF ARZNEIMITTEL [DE]) [Y] 1-38 * paragraph [0031] *;
 [Y]US2011059141  (ITO TAKESHI [JP]) [Y] 1-38 * abstract *;
 [A]US2011059169  (WENT GREGORY T [US], et al) [A] 1-38* examples 17-18 *;
 [XY]US2011313372  (EIFLER RENE [DE], et al) [X] 19,34-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] * [Y] 1-38;
 [XYI]US2012245537  (HORSTMANN MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 19,34-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] , [0 55] - [0056] * [Y] 1-38 [I] 1-38;
 [XP]WO2017117554  (CORIUM INT INC [US]) [XP] 1-38 * paragraph [0093]; example 6 *
by applicantUS3391142
 US3546141
 US3549016
 US4122193
 US4273774
 US5026556
 US5061703
 US5424077
 WO9640087
 US2003170308
 US2004087658
 US2005113458
 US6929801
 WO2005079779
 US2006035888
 US2006205822
 US7176185
 US2008107719
 EP1682109
 US2009081259
 US2009124659
 US2009156639
 US7682628
 US2010227852
 EP2260839
 WO2011070361
 US8874879
    - CHLADEK et al., J. Appl. Biomed., (20080000), vol. 6, pages 39 - 45
    - PASTORE et al., Br JPharmacol., (20150000), vol. 172, no. 9, pages 2179 - 2209
    - HIGUCHI et al., "American Chemical Society Symposium Series", Pro drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, vol. 14
    - BRANTSEVA et al., European Polymer Journal, (20160000), vol. 76, pages 228 - 244
    - FORCHETTI et al., "Treating Patients with Moderate to Severe Alzheimer's Disease: Implications of Recent Pharmacologic Studies", Prim Care Companion J Clin Psychiatry, (20050000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 155 - 161
    - SOZIO et al., Neurophsychiatric Disease and Treatment, (20120000), vol. 8, pages 361 - 368
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.