Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3494062

EP3494062 - PACKAGE FOR A POUCH, COMBINATION OF A PACKAGE AND A POUCH, AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING AND FILLING A PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/24]A PACKAGE AND A METHOD OF ASSEMBLING AND FILLING SUCH PACKAGE
[2019/36]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
A Company Registered In England And Wales
Under Company No. 41424 Of Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / WEISS, Isabell, Maria
Unilever Deutschland Holding GmbH
Knorrstrasse 1
74074 Heilbronn / DE
 [2019/24]
Representative(s)van den Brom, Coenraad Richard
Unilever Patent Group
Bronland 14
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/24]van den Brom, Coenraad Richard
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date17749680.931.07.2017
[2019/24]
WO2017EP69267
Priority number, dateEP2016018309905.08.2016         Original published format: EP 16183099
[2019/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018024651
Date:08.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3494062
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65D75/52, B65D77/06, B65D5/02, B65D5/04, B65D5/42
[2019/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNG FÜR EINEN BEUTEL, KOMBINATION AUS EINER VERPACKUNG UND EINEM BEUTEL, UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN UND BEFÜLLEN EINER VERPACKUNG[2019/36]
English:PACKAGE FOR A POUCH, COMBINATION OF A PACKAGE AND A POUCH, AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING AND FILLING A PACKAGE[2019/36]
French:EMBALLAGE POUR UN SACHET, ENSEMBLE COMPRENANT UN EMBALLAGE ET UN SACHET, ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE ET DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN EMBALLAGE[2019/36]
Former [2019/24]VERPACKUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENBAUEN UND FÜLLEN DER VERPACKUNG
Former [2019/24]A PACKAGE AND A METHOD OF ASSEMBLING AND FILLING SUCH PACKAGE
Former [2019/24]EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE ET DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN TEL EMBALLAGE
Entry into regional phase25.01.2019National basic fee paid 
25.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
25.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US4676394  (HIERSTEINER WALTER [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 5, line 34 - column 7, line 36; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US3917064  (ROCCAFORTE HARRY I) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]FR2604972  (BERNHARDT & CIE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 1 - line 7 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JP2003237838  (FUJI SEAL INC) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
by applicantGB789294
 GB980051
 US4676394
 WO03086897
 US3684156
 JP2007022611
 WO2014133573