blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3497206

EP3497206 - INFECTIOUS BRONCHITIS (IB) VIRUS VARIANTS AND RELATED COMPOSITIONS, USES AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2020  [2020/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Anicon Labor GmbH
Mühlenstraße 13
49685 Höltinghausen / DE
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / LIMAN, Martin
Schulweg 99A
26209 Hatten / DE
02 / OLDOPP, Theresa
Paterhäuser 12
49774 Herssum / DE
03 / HANEKE, Jennifer
Sonnentauweg 8
49439 Mühlen / DE
04 / BIELENBERG, Wiebke
Südstrasse 40
28857 Syke / DE
05 / VOGEL, Natalie
Beethovenstrasse 9
49356 Diepholz / DE
06 / RÖNCHEN, Swaantje
An der Seekenkapelle 23
49377 Vechta / DE
07 / PETZOLDT, Diana
Potsdamerstrasse 20
49661 Cloppenburg / DE
08 / BEHR, Klaus-Peter
Hagelerstrasse 1
26197 Grossenkneten / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/25]01 / LIMAN, Martin
Schulweg 99A
26209 Hatten / DE
02 / OLDOPP, Theresa
Paterhäuser 12
49774 Herssum / DE
03 / HANEKE, Jennifer
Orffstrasse 6
49661 Cloppenburg / DE
04 / BIELENBERG, Wiebke
Hachedamm 24
28857 Syke / DE
05 / VOGEL, Natalie
Beethovenstrasse 9
49356 Diepholz / DE
06 / RÖNCHEN, Swaantje
An der Seekenkapelle 23
49377 Vechta / DE
07 / PETZOLDT, Diana
Potsdamerstrasse 20
49661 Cloppenburg / DE
08 / BEHR, Klaus-Peter
Hagelerstrasse 1
26197 Grossenkneten / DE
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
[2019/25]
Application number, filing date17755136.314.08.2017
[2019/25]
WO2017EP70616
Priority number, dateDE20161021511812.08.2016         Original published format: DE102016215118
[2019/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018029383
Date:15.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3497206
Date:19.06.2019
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:C12N7/00, C07K14/005, A61K39/12, A61K35/76
[2019/25]
CPC:
C12N7/00 (EP,US); A61K39/12 (US); A61K35/76 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP,US); C07K14/005 (EP); C07K16/10 (US);
C07K16/1003 (EP); A61K2039/5254 (US); A61K39/00 (EP);
C12N2770/20021 (EP); C12N2770/20022 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
TitleGerman:INFEKTIÖSE BRONCHITIS (IB)-VIRUS VARIANTEN UND DIESBEZÜGLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERWENDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN[2019/25]
English:INFECTIOUS BRONCHITIS (IB) VIRUS VARIANTS AND RELATED COMPOSITIONS, USES AND METHOD[2019/25]
French:VARIANTES DU VIRUS DE LA BRONCHITE INFECTIEUSE (BI) ET COMPOSITIONS, UTILISATIONS ET PROCÉDÉS LES CONCERNANT[2019/25]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase12.03.2019National basic fee paid 
12.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/25]
12.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/46]
26.06.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2020/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.202004   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2016064841  (UNIV AUBURN [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9 * paragraph [0003] * * sequence 1 *[I] 2,4;
 [XI]  - PHILLIPS J E ET AL, "Changes in nonstructural protein 3 are associated with attenuation in avian coronavirus infectious bronchitis virus", VIRUS GENES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20110910), vol. 44, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S11262-011-0668-7, ISSN 1572-994X, pages 63 - 74, XP035005562 [X] 1,5-9 * Genbank GQ504722; page 66, column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 2,4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11262-011-0668-7
 [XI]  - VALASTRO VIVIANA ET AL, "S1 gene-based phylogeny of infectious bronchitis virus: An attempt to harmonize virus classification", INFECTION, GENETICS AND EVOLUTION, (20160212), vol. 39, doi:10.1016/J.MEEGID.2016.02.015, ISSN 1567-1348, pages 349 - 364, XP029457163 [X] 1,5-9 * the whole document * [I] 2,4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.meegid.2016.02.015
by applicantWO02057302
 US2008069838
    - CAVANAGH, D., "Coronaviruses in poultry and other birds", Avian Pathol., (20050000), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 439 - 448
    - CAVANAGH, D., "Coronavirus avian infection bronchitis virus", Vet. Res., (20070000), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 281 - 297
    - VALASTRO V.; HOLMES E.C.; BRITTON P.; FUSARO A.; JACKWOOD M.W.; CATTOLI G.; MONNE I., "S1 gene-based phylogeny of infectious bronchitis virus: An attampt to harmonize virus classification", Infection, Genetics and Evolution, (20160000), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1016/j.meegid.2016.02.015, pages 349 - 364, XP029457163

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.meegid.2016.02.015
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, John Wiley & Sons, (19890000), pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6
    - Basic Methods in Molecular Biology, Elsevier Science Publishing Co., Inc., (19860000), pages 75 - 78,84-87
    - Molecular Cloning, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory, (19820000), pages 387 - 389
    - HIGGINS, D. G.; P. M. SHARP, CABIOS, (19890000), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153
    - HIGGINS, D. G. et al., CABIOS, (19920000), vol. 8, pages 189 - 191
    - ALTSCHUL, S. F. et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - TAO et al., J. Virol., vol. 72, pages 2955 - 2961
    - DURBIN et al., J. Virol., (20000000), vol. 74, pages 6821 - 6831
    - SKIADOPOULOS et al., J. Virol., (19980000), vol. 72, pages 1762 - 1768
    - TENG et al., J. Virol., (20000000), vol. 74, pages 9317 - 9321
    - GIOVANNI FRANZO; VALERIA LISTORTI; CLIVE J. NAYLOR; CATERINA LUPINI; ANDREA LACONI; VIVIANA FELICE; MICHELE DRIGO; ELENA CATELLI;, "Molecular investigation of a full-length genome of a Q1-like IBV strain isolated in Italy in 2013", Virus Research, (20150000), vol. 210, pages 77 - 80
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.