Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464058

EP3464058 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR OPTIMISING OPERATION OF A VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.05.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eniram Oy
P.O. Box 1834
00080 Wärtsilä / FI
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ANTOLA, Matti
Vaasankatu 18 B 30
00500 Helsinki / FI
02 / SOLONEN, Antti
Rauduntie 7 G
02130 Espoo / FI
03 / PYÖRRE, Jussi
Kainalhontie 4B
03250 Ojakkala / FI
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Suominen, Kaisa Liisa
Moosedog Oy
Rykmentintie 2B
20810 Turku / FI
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17755554.702.08.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FI50561
Priority number, dateFI2016000561009.08.2016         Original published format: FI 20165610
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018029397
Date:15.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464058
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:B63J99/00, G01C21/12
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES SCHIFFES[2019/15]
English:A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR OPTIMISING OPERATION OF A VESSEL[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'OPTIMISATION DE L'EXPLOITATION D'UN NAVIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
03.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010106350  (ALSTON GERALD ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]EP3042843  (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0134]; figures 1-17 *;
 [A]WO2016110693  (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-17 * page 8, line 8 - page 39, line 29; figures 1-17 *;
 [A]US2014336853  (BRADENHAM ROB [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-4 *
by applicantUS2009048726
 WO2015129337
 WO2016038249
    - BOS, M., "How MetOcean Data Can Improve Accuracy and Reliability of Vessel Performance Estimates", Proceedings of the HullPIC 2016 conference, (20160000), URL: http://data.hullpic.info/HuIlPIC2016. pdf.