Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3421991

EP3421991 - POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION PATCH, AND DIAGNOSTIC METHOD AND APPARATUS USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
26.04.2019Change - extension statespublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Noul Co., Ltd.
A-1404&1405
767 Sinsu-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16827 / KR
[2019/01]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Dong Young
515-1703
90 Jinsan-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16923 / KR
02 / LIM, Chan Yang
919-603
29 Seopangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13481 / KR
03 / KIM, Kyung Hwan
102-605
15 Yehyeon-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17103 / KR
 [2019/01]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/01]
Application number, filing date17756840.923.02.2017
[2019/01]
WO2017KR02026
Priority number, dateUS201662298959P23.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662298959 P
KR2016006993604.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069936
KR2016006993704.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069937
KR2016006993804.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069938
KR2016009573927.07.2016         Original published format: KR 20160095739
KR2016011846213.09.2016         Original published format: KR 20160118462
KR2016014455101.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160144551
[2019/01]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017146502
Date:31.08.2017
Language:KO
[2017/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3421991
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR31.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/483, G01N33/49, G01N33/487, G01N1/30, G01N15/14, G01N1/31, G01N33/58, G01N33/60
[2019/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/01]
TitleGerman:POLYMERASEKETTENREAKTIONSPFLASTER SOWIE DIAGNOSTISCHES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2019/01]
English:POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION PATCH, AND DIAGNOSTIC METHOD AND APPARATUS USING SAME[2019/01]
French:TIMBRE DE RÉACTION EN CHAÎNE PAR POLYMÉRASE, ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC L'UTILISANT[2019/01]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2018Translation filed 
21.08.2018National basic fee paid 
21.08.2018Search fee paid 
21.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]KR20150048964  (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-30 * See abstract; claims 1-21; paragraph [0030]; and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]US8936912  (MITRA ROBI M [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * See abstract; and claims 1-5. *;
 [A]US2004175710  (HAUSHALTER ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US6063029  (SAITA MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2014038230  (BECK MARKUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. *