Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3428641

EP3428641 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CTC DIAGNOSIS USING PATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
26.04.2019Change - extension statespublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Noul Co., Ltd.
A-1404&1405
767 Sinsu-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16827 / KR
[2019/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Dong Young
515-1703, 90 Jinsan-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16923 / KR
02 / LIM, Chan Yang
919-603, 29 Seopangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13481 / KR
03 / KIM, Kyung Hwan
102-605, 15 Yehyeon-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17103 / KR
 [2019/03]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/03]
Application number, filing date17756841.723.02.2017
[2019/03]
WO2017KR02027
Priority number, dateUS201662298959P23.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662298959 P
KR2016006993604.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069936
KR2016006993704.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069937
KR2016006993804.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069938
KR2016009573927.07.2016         Original published format: KR 20160095739
KR2016011846213.09.2016         Original published format: KR 20160118462
KR2016014455101.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160144551
[2019/03]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017146503
Date:31.08.2017
Language:KO
[2017/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3428641
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR31.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/483, G01N33/49, G01N33/487, G01N1/30, G01N15/14, G01N1/31, G01N33/58, G01N33/60
[2019/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CTC-DIAGNOSE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON PATCH[2019/03]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CTC DIAGNOSIS USING PATCH[2019/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC DE CELLULE TUMORALE CIRCULANTE (CTC) À L'AIDE D'UN TIMBRE[2019/03]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2018Translation filed 
21.08.2018National basic fee paid 
21.08.2018Search fee paid 
21.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US6063029  (SAITA MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * See abstract; claims 1-16; column 8, and figure 1(d). *;
 [A]US2014038230  (BECK MARKUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-26 * See abstract; claims 1-20; paragraphs [0014], [0020]-[0023], [0028]-[0030]; and figures 2-5. *;
 [A]US2013288273  (TAKAGI HIDENORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2011070606  (WINKELMAN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2011257666  (LADET SEBASTIEN [FR], et al) [A] 1-26 * See the entire document. *