Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3428642

EP3428642 - ANTIBODY-PROVIDING KIT, ANTIBODY-STORING PATCH, AND IMMUNITY DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Noul Co., Ltd.
A-1404&1405
767 Sinsu-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16827 / KR
[2019/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Dong Young
515-1703, 90 Jinsan-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16923 / KR
02 / LIM, Chan Yang
919-603, 29 Seopangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13481 / KR
03 / KIM, Kyung Hwan
102-605, 15 Yehyeon-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17103 / KR
 [2019/03]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/03]
Application number, filing date17756842.523.02.2017
[2019/03]
WO2017KR02028
Priority number, dateUS201662298959P23.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662298959 P
KR2016006993604.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069936
KR2016006993704.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069937
KR2016006993804.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069938
KR2016009573927.07.2016         Original published format: KR 20160095739
KR2016011846213.09.2016         Original published format: KR 20160118462
KR2016014455101.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160144551
[2019/03]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017146504
Date:31.08.2017
Language:KO
[2017/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3428642
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR31.08.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/483, G01N33/49, G01N33/487, G01N1/30, G01N15/14, G01N1/31, G01N33/58, G01N33/60, G01N1/28, B01F13/00, G01N33/558, B01L7/00, C12Q1/6848, G01N15/06, G01N15/00, G01N21/77, B01L3/00, G01N33/50, G01N33/52
[2019/34]
Former International [2019/03]G01N33/483, G01N33/49, G01N33/487, G01N1/30, G01N15/14, G01N1/31, G01N33/58, G01N33/60
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/03]
TitleGerman:ANTIKÖRPERBEREITSTELLUNGSKIT, ANTIKÖRPERSPEICHERNDES PFLASTER UND IMMUNITÄTSDIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2019/03]
English:ANTIBODY-PROVIDING KIT, ANTIBODY-STORING PATCH, AND IMMUNITY DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND DEVICE USING SAME[2019/03]
French:NÉCESSAIRE DE FOURNITURE D'ANTICORPS, TIMBRE DE STOCKAGE D'ANTICORPS, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC D'IMMUNITÉ L'UTILISANT[2019/03]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2018Translation filed 
21.08.2018National basic fee paid 
21.08.2018Search fee paid 
21.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010168390  (BRIX LISELOTTE [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,14,15 * para 364, example 41 * [I] 9,11;
 [XI]US2006115905  (HATCH ANSON [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * Fig 1 ; para 22-24, 27, 38, 40, 46 ; Fig 1 ; claim 1 * [I] 9-11;
 [X]US2014038230  (BECK MARKUS [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,14 * paragraph [0014] *;
 [X]US6063029  (SAITA MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,12,14,15 * example 6, 8, 10-12 ; col 9, l 8-13 *;
 [XI]JP2004077387  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * para 13, 29, 65-66 ; Fig 4 ; example 1 * [I] 9,11;
 [E]WO2017048871  (ESSENLIX CORP [US]) [E] 1-3,5-10,13 * pg 38, l 16 - 19 ; pg 105, l 31 - pg 106, l 27 ; example 31 ; Fig 1 ; claims 58-62 *
 [XI]  - J. WU ET AL, "Disposable Reagentless Electrochemical Immunosensor Array Based on a Biopolymer/Sol-Gel Membrane for Simultaneous Measurement of Several Tumor Markers", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (20080804), vol. 54, no. 9, doi:10.1373/clinchem.2007.102350, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1481 - 1488, XP055601934 [X] 1,2,4-7,12,14,15 * abstract ; Fig 1 ; pg 1483, col 1, para 1 * [I] 9,11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2007.102350
 [XI]  - HIDEKI WAKAYAMA ET AL, "Design of a single-step immunoassay principle based on the combination of an enzyme-labeled antibody release coating and a hydrogel copolymerized with a fluorescent enzyme substrate in a microfluidic capillary device", LAB ON A CHIP, (20130101), vol. 13, no. 22, doi:10.1039/c3lc50775k, ISSN 1473-0197, page 4304, XP055602024 [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract ; Fig 1 ; pg 4306, col 2, last para * [I] 9,11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3lc50775k
International search[A]US2014038230  (BECK MARKUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-31 * See abstract; claims 1-20; paragraphs [0014], [0020]-[0023], [0028]-[0030]; and figures 2-5. *;
 [A]US6063029  (SAITA MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2011070606  (WINKELMAN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2011257666  (LADET SEBASTIEN [FR], et al) [A] 1-31 * See the entire document. *
 [A]  - BECK, MARKUS et al., "On-chip Sample Preparation by Controlled Release of Antibodies for Simple CD 4 Counting", Lab on a Chip, (20120107), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 167 - 173, XP055534042 [A] 1-31 * See abstract; pages 167-169; and figures 1-3. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C1LC20565J