Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3428644

EP3428644 - BLOOD STAINING PATCH, AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING BLOOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Noul Co., Ltd.
A-1404&1405
767 Sinsu-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16827 / KR
[2019/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Dong Young
515-1703, 90 Jinsan-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16923 / KR
02 / LIM, Chan Yang
919-603, 29 Seopangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13481 / KR
03 / KIM, Kyung Hwan
102-605, 15 Yehyeon-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17103 / KR
04 / SHIN, Young Min
512-701, 64 Dongcheon-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16825 / KR
05 / YANG, Hyun Jeong
1205-804, 10 Migeum-ro 22beon-gil
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13626 / KR
 [2019/03]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/03]
Application number, filing date17756844.123.02.2017
[2019/03]
WO2017KR02030
Priority number, dateUS201662298959P23.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662298959 P
KR2016006993604.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069936
KR2016006993704.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069937
KR2016006993804.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069938
KR2016009573927.07.2016         Original published format: KR 20160095739
KR2016011846213.09.2016         Original published format: KR 20160118462
KR2016014455101.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160144551
[2019/03]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017146506
Date:31.08.2017
Language:KO
[2017/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3428644
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR31.08.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/483, G01N33/49, G01N33/487, G01N1/30, G01N15/14, G01N1/31, G01N33/58, G01N33/60, G01N1/28, B01F13/00, G01N33/558, B01L7/00, C12Q1/6848, G01N15/06, G01N15/00, G01N21/77, B01L3/00, G01N33/50, G01N33/52
[2019/43]
Former International [2019/03]G01N33/483, G01N33/49, G01N33/487, G01N1/30, G01N15/14, G01N1/31, G01N33/58, G01N33/60
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/03]
TitleGerman:BLUTFÄRBEPFLASTER UND VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TESTEN VON BLUT DAMIT[2019/03]
English:BLOOD STAINING PATCH, AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING BLOOD USING SAME[2019/03]
French:PATCH DE COLORATION DU SANG, ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ANALYSER LE SANG L'UTILISANT[2019/03]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2018Translation filed 
21.08.2018National basic fee paid 
21.08.2018Search fee paid 
21.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US3870146  (GREENFIELD WALTER, et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10,12-14 * claims ; col 1, l 57-62 ; col 2, l 20-30 * [I] 11,15;
 [X]US2014038230  (BECK MARKUS [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,10,13 * paragraph [0014] *;
 [X]EP2940474  (NAT CANCER CT [KR]) [X] 1-4 * claims ; para 13, 27 ; Fig 14 *;
 [X]  - Anonymous, "BD? EMB Agar (Eosin Methylene Blue Agar), Modified INTENDED USE", (20130101), URL: http://legacy.bd.com/resource.aspx?IDX=8973, (20190705), XP055602725 [X] 1,2,4-6,8,13,14 * pg 1, para 1-2 ; pg 2, para "procedure" *
 [X]  - Anonymous, "Histology Vol II: Laboratory products for your histology needs", Cardinal Health, (20130101), URL: https://www.henryschein.com/assets/Medical/2883001.pdf, (20190619), XP055597763 [X] 1,2,4 * fig pg 1 *
 [X]  - ROMANO ILARIA ET AL, "Controlled antiseptic/eosin release from chitosan-based hydrogel modified fibrous substrates", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (20150603), vol. 131, doi:10.1016/J.CARBPOL.2015.05.057, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 306 - 314, XP029252743 [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2015.05.057
 [X]  - SUPRIYA PUNYANI ET AL, "Sustained release of iodine from a polymeric hydrogel device for water disinfection", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, US, (20060101), vol. 103, no. 5, doi:10.1002/app.25496, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 3334 - 3340, XP055602635 [X] 1,2 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.25496
 [X]  - KEITH N. RAND, "Crystal violet can be used to visualize DNA bands during gel electrophoresis and to improve cloning efficiency", TECHNICAL TIPS ONLINE, United Kingdom, (19960101), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S1366-2120(07)70016-8, ISSN 1366-2120, pages 23 - 24, XP055602535 [X] 1,2 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1366-2120(07)70016-8
International search[A]US2014038230  (BECK MARKUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; paragraphs [0014J, [0019]-[0023]. [0029]-[0030]; claims 1-16; figures 1-5. *;
 [A]US3870146  (GREENFIELD WALTER, et al) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US4250257  (LEE MARTIN J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]KR100601831B  (LG CHEM, LTD.) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2005202567  (ZANZUCCHI PETER J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *
 [A]  - BECK, MARKUS et al., "On-chip Sample Preparation by Controlled Release of Antibodies for Simple CD 4 Counting", Lab on a Chip, (20120000), vol. 12, pages 167 - 173, XP055411785 [A] 1-20 * See abstract; pages 167-169, figures 1-3. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C1LC20565J