Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3421993

EP3421993 - DIAGNOSTIC METHOD, AND DEVICE FOR EXECUTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Noul Co., Ltd.
A-1404&1405
767 Sinsu-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16827 / KR
[2019/01]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Dong Young
515-1703,90 Jinsan-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16923 / KR
02 / LIM, Chan Yang
919-603, 29 Seopangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13481 / KR
03 / KIM, Kyung Hwan
102-605, 15 Yehyeon-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17103 / KR
04 / SHIN, Young Min
512-701, 64 Dongcheon-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16825 / KR
05 / YANG, Hyun Jeong
1205-804,10 Migeum-ro 22beon-gil
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13626 / KR
 [2019/01]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/01]
Application number, filing date17756846.623.02.2017
[2019/01]
WO2017KR02032
Priority number, dateUS201662298959P23.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662298959 P
KR2016006993604.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069936
KR2016006993704.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069937
KR2016006993804.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160069938
KR2016009573927.07.2016         Original published format: KR 20160095739
KR2016011846213.09.2016         Original published format: KR 20160118462
KR2016014455101.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160144551
[2019/01]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017146508
Date:31.08.2017
Language:KO
[2017/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3421993
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR31.08.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/483, G01N33/49, G01N33/487, G01N1/30, G01N15/14, G01N1/31, G01N33/58, G01N33/60, G01N1/28, B01F13/00, G01N33/558, B01L7/00, C12Q1/6848, G01N15/06, G01N15/00, G01N21/77, B01L3/00, G01N33/50, G01N33/52, // C12Q1/6844
[2019/46]
Former International [2019/01]G01N33/483, G01N33/49, G01N33/487, G01N1/30, G01N15/14, G01N21/78, G01N21/77, G01N1/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/01]
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG DAVON[2019/01]
English:DIAGNOSTIC METHOD, AND DEVICE FOR EXECUTING SAME[2019/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC, ET DISPOSITIF POUR EXÉCUTER CELUI-CI[2019/01]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2018Translation filed 
21.08.2018National basic fee paid 
21.08.2018Search fee paid 
21.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2072993  (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] *;
 [A]  - SILVIYA P. ZUSTIAK ET AL, "Solute diffusion and interactions in cross-linked poly(ethylene glycol) hydrogels studied by Fluorescence Correlation Spectroscopy", SOFT MATTER, (20100807), vol. 6, no. 15, doi:10.1039/c0sm00111b, ISSN 1744-683X, page 3609, XP055597397 [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 2.2 - page 4 * * page 3, paragraph 2.1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0sm00111b
International search[A]US2014038230  (BECK MARKUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-24 * See abstract; paragraphs [00141, [0019]-[0023], [0028]-[0030], [0041]-[0042]; claims 1-16; figures 1-5. *;
 [A]US2011070606  (WINKELMAN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2007128073  (TAPPEN FRANK M [US]) [A] 1-24 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2014004527  (OKA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]KR100601831B  (LG CHEM, LTD.) [A] 1-24 * See the entire document. *