12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
30.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
16.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
19.11.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.11.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.11.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.11.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
04.07.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.06.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
18.06.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
26.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
26.04.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
26.04.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
16.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.11.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
05.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.08.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
21.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|